Maryland District Court
Judge:Paula Xinis
Case #: 8:24-cv-00421
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 5:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Sara C Brown
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Cynthia Burke
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Susan J Knafla
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Jessica L McAllum
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Walid M Rawash
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Danyale S Warren
Represented By
Michael Jackman Wilson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Amadou Diallo
125 High Street
Sharon Hill, PA 19079

GPO Mar 05 2025
CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/5/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/20 9:19 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kristi Noem.(Wilson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/06 4:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Amadou Diallo.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
24 24 misc Rule 12/56 Tue 04/15 8:27 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Amadou Diallo (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Summary Judgment Mon 04/14 4:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kristi Noem(Wilson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration of John F. Dymond,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14,
Att: 17 Exhibit 15,
Att: 18 Exhibit 16,
Att: 19 Exhibit 17,
Att: 20 Exhibit 18,
Att: 21 Exhibit 19,
Att: 22 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/31 2:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kristi Noem, filed by Amadou Diallo.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
21 21 misc Supplement Mon 03/10 11:48 AM
Additional Evidence to1 Complaint, filed by Amadou Diallo(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Envelope
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/05 12:54 PM
CORRECTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, the Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Cynthia Burke, Walid M. Rawash, Danyale S. Warren, Jessica L. McAllum, Sara C. Brown, and Susan J. Knafla are dismissed; denying15 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; the Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/5/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 16 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 03/05 12:49 PM
CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/5/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Sanctions Wed 03/05 11:38 AM
(DOCKETED IN ERROR) ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, the Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Cynthia Burke, Walid M. Rawash, Danyale S. Warren, Jessica L. McAllum, Sara C. Brown, and Susan J. Knafla are dismissed; denying15 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; the Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint within twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/5/2025. (c/m to P on 3/5/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk) (heps). Modified on 3/5/2025 (heps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/5/2025) CORRECTED MAIN DOCUMENT
17 17 order Memorandum Opinion Wed 03/05 11:32 AM
(DOCKETED IN ERROR) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/5/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (heps). Modified on 3/5/2025 (heps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/5/2025) CORRECTED MAIN DOCUMENT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/25 3:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Sara C Brown, Cynthia Burke, Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Susan J Knafla, Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary, Jessica L McAllum, Walid M Rawash, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Danyale S Warren.(Wilson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 20, 2024
15 15 motion Sanctions Mon 09/23 2:16 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by Amadou Diallo.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, September 12, 2024
14 14 3 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/12 10:48 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sara C Brown, Cynthia Burke, Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Susan J Knafla, Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary, Jessica L McAllum, Walid M Rawash, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Danyale S Warren.(Wilson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
13 13 1 pgs misc Supplement Wed 09/11 11:47 AM
Supplement to12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Amadou Diallo(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 16
Friday, August 30, 2024
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/30 3:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Amadou Diallo.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 9 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 9 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 71 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 22 pgs Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 8 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 3 pgs Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 37 pgs Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 13 pgs Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 19 pgs Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 4 pgs Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 3 pgs Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 38 pgs Exhibit 15
Thursday, August 08, 2024
11 11 5 pgs misc Rule 12/56 Thu 08/08 8:42 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Amadou Diallo (c/m to P on 8/8/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
10 10 2 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/07 1:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Sara C Brown, Cynthia Burke, Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Susan J Knafla, Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary, Jessica L McAllum, Walid M Rawash, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Danyale S Warren(Wilson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 28 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 3 pgs Declaration of John F. Dymond,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 31 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 13 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 10 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 8 pgs Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 13 pgs Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 4 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2024
9 9 3 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/02 11:02 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Amadou Diallo.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 27, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 06/27 10:22 AM
ORDER granting7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to1 Complaint, Sara C Brown answer due 8/7/2024; Cynthia Burke answer due 8/7/2024; Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate answer due 8/7/2024; Susan J Knafla answer due 8/7/2024; Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary answer due 8/7/2024; Jessica L McAllum answer due 8/7/2024; Walid M Rawash answer due 8/7/2024; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services answer due 8/7/2024; U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 8/7/2024; Danyale S Warren answer due 8/7/2024.. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/27/2024. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 06/26 7:29 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sara C Brown, Cynthia Burke, Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Susan J Knafla, Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary, Jessica L McAllum, Walid M Rawash, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Danyale S Warren(Wilson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 13, 2024
6 6 18 pgs service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 05/14 3:37 PM
Proof of Service filed by Amadou Diallo.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 18 pgs service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 04/03 9:19 AM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Sara C Brown, Cynthia Burke, Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Susan J Knafla, Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary, Jessica L McAllum, Walid M Rawash, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Danyale S Warren, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(c/m as directed 4/3/2024 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/29 12:51 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to submit completed summons to the Clerk for issuance. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/29/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
3 3 2 pgs misc New Case Notification Letter Fri 02/16 8:28 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Amadou Diallo. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Fri 02/16 8:16 AM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Amadou Diallo. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/16 8:16 AM
COMPLAINT against Sara C Brown, Cynthia Burke, Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate, Susan J Knafla, Alejandro Nicholas Mayorkas, Secretary, Jessica L McAllum, Walid M Rawash, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Danyale S Warren ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 7614.), filed by Amadou Diallo.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 9 pgs Certificate of Service