California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:24-cv-00902
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 13, 2024 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Samsara, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Allen Loy
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Nyc
contact info
Ali-Reza Boloori
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Jeanne M. Heffernan
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Karthik Ravishankar
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Ellisen Shelton Turner
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Joshua L Simmons
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Motive Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Pyo
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
David Spencer Bloch
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Yang Liu
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
James J DeCarlo
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info
Cecil Bryan Wilson
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Jack Henry Danon
Williams & Connolly LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
91 91 motion Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Mon 04/28 7:59 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Samsara, Inc..(Turner, Ellisen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ellisen S. Turner,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A (SEALED),
Att: 4 Exhibit B (SEALED),
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E (SEALED),
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G
Friday, April 25, 2025
90 90 misc Statement Fri 04/25 7:40 PM
Statement re 85 Order,,,,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, Joint Proposed Case Schedule by Motive Technologies, Inc., Samsara, Inc.. (Boloori, Ali-Reza)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
88 88 order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/23 10:00 AM
Order by Judge James Donato granting 87 Stipulation. The parties' deadline to file a jointly proposed case schedule is extended to April 25, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
87 87 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/22 12:03 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Deadline to File Joint Proposed Case Schedule re 85 Order, Terminate Motions, filed by Motive Technologies, Inc., Samsara, Inc.. (Boloori, Ali-Reza) Modified on 4/22/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]