Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Case #: 1:24-cv-00447
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause12:2601 Real Estate Settlement Procedure Act of 1974 (RESPA)
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 13, 2024 2:17 AM MDT
Defendant
Colorado Housing and Finance Authority
Represented By
Alison Lee Berry
Janeway Law Firm P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By
Alison Lee Berry
Janeway Law Firm P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kwame Samuel Williams
a man [E-filer effective 2/23/24] 10395 Gaylord Street
Thornton, CO 80229


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
25 25 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 12/04 8:08 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to20 Notice of Appeal filed by Kwame Samuel Williams,24 USCA Order/Opinion/Judgment : (USCA Case No. 24-1334 (sphil, )
Related: [-]
24 24 appeal USCA Order/Opinion/Judgment Wed 12/04 8:05 AM
USCA Order as to20 Notice of Appeal filed by Kwame Samuel Williams : (USCA Case No. 24-1334 . This appeal is dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to Tenth Circuit Rule 42.1. (This document is not the Mandate) (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
23 23 appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA Wed 10/02 11:19 AM
RECORD ON APPEAL filed by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit re:20 Notice of Appeal filed by Kwame Samuel Williams. Volume I - Pleadings. (USCA Case No. 24-1334 . (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
22 22 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 08/23 3:51 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1334 for20 Notice of Appeal filed by Kwame Samuel Williams. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
21 21 appeal Letter Transmitting Notice of Appeal Thu 08/22 10:05 AM
LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the20 Notice of Appeal filed by Kwame Samuel Williams to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid and 1915 motion not filed,)(sphil, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Preliminary Record
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
20 20 appeal Notice of Appeal - 10th Circuit Wed 08/21 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Kwame Samuel Williams(Williams, Kwame)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Final Judgement
Monday, July 22, 2024
19 19 order Judgment Mon 07/22 3:32 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT:7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, case is closed. By Clerk on 7/22/24. (jdyne)
Related: [-]
18 18 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 07/22 3:22 PM
ORDER affirming and adopting15 Report and Recommendations; granting7 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 7/22/24.(jdyne)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation Fri 06/14 12:29 PM
RESPONSE to Objection to15 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. filed by Defendants Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.. (Berry, Alison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
16 16 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 06/05 1:19 PM
OBJECTION to15 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Kwame Samuel Williams. (Williams, Kwame)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
15 15 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 05/23 2:43 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ONDEFENDANTS DOVENMUEHLE MORTGAGE, INC. AND COLORADO HOUSING AND FINANCE AUTHORITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (ECF No.7 ) The Court has taken judicial notice of the Court's file and considered the applicable Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and case law. Now, being fully informed and for the reasons discussed herein, it is RECOMMENDED that that the subject Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 5/23/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
14 14 minutes Status Conference Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/25 1:45 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 4/25/2024. All discovery is STAYED pending further order of court. Defendants Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. and Colorado Housing and Finance Authoritys Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. #7 ) is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. FTR: Courtroom A401. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 order Minute Order Mon 04/22 9:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The upcoming Status Conference on April 25, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. shall be conducted via telephone . Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# to participate. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on April 22, 2024. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
12 12 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/08 9:09 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Motion to Dismiss ECF No.7 referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 4/8/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Reassigning Case Fri 04/05 3:33 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00447-CNS. (Text Only Entry) (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Fri 04/05 1:25 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kwame Samuel Williams All parties do not consent.. (Williams, Kwame)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/05 12:34 PM
REPLY to Response to7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.. (Berry, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
8 8 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/22 7:45 PM
RESPONSE to7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kwame Samuel Williams. (Williams, Kwame)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Thu 03/14 10:08 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc..(Berry, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Note,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Deed of Trust,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Notice of Election and Demand,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Verified Motion for Order Authorizing Sale,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Response to Notice
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 02/28 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alison Lee Berry on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Alison Lee Berry added to party Colorado Housing and Finance Authority(pty:dft), Attorney Alison Lee Berry added to party Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc.(pty:dft) (Berry, Alison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 02/27 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kwame Samuel Williams. Colorado Housing and Finance Authority served on 2/26/2024, answer due 3/18/2024; Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. served on 2/23/2024, answer due 3/15/2024.(Williams, Kwame)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Return Of Service
Thursday, February 15, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/16 8:42 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF. On or before April 11, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. # 3 -1), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Status Conference shall be held on: April 25, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294 Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a written request is made FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/15/2024. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Thu 02/15 2:13 PM
SUMMONS issued over-the-counter by Clerk. (blaws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Thu 02/15 2:11 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/15 2:09 PM
VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Damages against Colorado Housing and Finance Authority, Dovenmuehle Mortgage, Inc. (Filing Fee: $405.00, Receipt Number: 109769), filed by Kwame Samuel Williams. (blaws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Summons