Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:23-bk-13579

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:24-ap-01014
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Starkeisha Sharnay Jester
2792 Genevieve Street
San Bernardino, CA 92405
Represented By
Starkeisha Sharnay Jester
contact info
Plaintiff
University Of Southern California
Represented By
Jennifer L Nassiri
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Trustee
Larry D Simons (TR)
3610 Central Avenue, Suite 400
Riverside, CA 92506
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
38 38 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 03/27 1:29 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FILED 3/21/25 (JL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
Friday, March 21, 2025
37 37 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 03/21 4:38 PM
Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California (Lattner, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
36 36 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 02/20 1:15 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/26/2025 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle. No Status Report Required. (JL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
35 35 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 12/04 3:33 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 2/19/2025 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 12/04 3:31 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/19/2025 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 301 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by University Of Southern California
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 10/30 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Monday, October 28, 2024
33 33 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Mon 10/28 9:58 AM
Order Approving Third Stipulation to extend deadlines to complete discovery and file and serve dispositive motions. (See order for details) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/28/2024 (JC6)
Related: [-] 31
Friday, October 25, 2024
32 32 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 10/25 5:35 PM
Notice of lodgment Order Or Judgment In Adversary Proceeding Re Third Stipulation To Extend Deadlines To Complete Discovery And File And Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Lattner, Alexandria)
Related: [-] 31 Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Starkeisha Sharnay Jester (Third Stipulation) To Extend Deadlines To Complete Discovery And File And Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
31 31 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 10/25 4:43 PM
Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Starkeisha Sharnay Jester (Third Stipulation) To Extend Deadlines To Complete Discovery And File And Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California (Lattner, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
30 30 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 08/21 4:33 PM
Hearing Held on Status Conference Related [+] - Vacated. Off Calendar. Continued to 12/4/24 by order entered 8/15/24. (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
Saturday, August 17, 2024
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 08/17 10:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, August 15, 2024
28 28 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 08/15 1:36 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Adjourn the August 21, 2024 Status Conference. The Status Conference shall be continued to December 4, 2024 at 2:00 pm (See Order for Details) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/15/2024 Related [+]. (CJ)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 08/15 1:38 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 12/04/2024 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 301 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (CJ)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by University Of Southern California
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
27 27 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 08/14 10:08 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order in Adversary Proceeding Re: Stipulation to Adjourn the August 21, 2024 Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Stipulation to Adjourn the August 21, 2024 Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
26 26 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 08/14 10:03 PM
Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Stipulation to Adjourn the August 21, 2024 Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 08/01 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
24 24 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Tue 07/30 10:25 AM
Order Approving Second stipulation to extend deadlines to complete discovery and file and serve dispositive motions (See order for details) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/30/2024 (JC6)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, July 29, 2024
23 23 misc Notice of Lodgment Mon 07/29 9:13 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding Re: Second Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File and Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Second Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File and Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
22 22 misc Proof of service Mon 07/29 8:55 PM
Proof of service for Second Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File and Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Second Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File and Serve Dispositive Motions
21 21 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 07/29 8:31 PM
Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Second Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File and Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 07/07 9:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Friday, July 05, 2024
19 19 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Fri 07/05 11:06 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to extend deadlines to complete discovery and file and serve dispositive motions (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 7/5/2024 (JC6)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
18 18 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 07/03 2:53 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Starkeisha Sharnay Jester to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File and Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
17 17 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 07/03 2:37 PM
Stipulation By University Of Southern California and Starkeisha Sharnay Jester to Extend Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File and Serve Dispositive Motions Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 28, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/28 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 26, 2024
15 15 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/26 10:57 AM
Status Conference and Scheduling Order. Continued to the following date for a further status conference: August 21, 2024 @ 2:00 p.m. A joint status report must be filed and served, including a judges copy, by August 14, 2024. The last day for discovery to be completed, including receiving responses to discovery requests, is July 15, 2024 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/26/2024. The last date for dispositive motions to be filed and served, including a judges copy, is:July 31, 2024 (JC6)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
14 14 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 04/25 4:08 PM
Notice of lodgment Order Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 6:24-ap-01014. Complaint by University Of Southern California against Starkeisha Sharnay Jester. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)) filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
Thursday, April 18, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 04/18 1:01 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 08/21/2024 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 301 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by University Of Southern California
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
13 13 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 04/18 2:05 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 8/21/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Joint Status Report due 8/14/24. Scheduling order due 4/26/24. Discovery cutoff 7/15/24. Last day to file dispositive motions 7/31/24. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
12 12 misc Status report Wed 04/03 4:44 PM
Status report (Joint) Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 03/27 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Monday, March 25, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/25 7:20 PM
Answer to Complaint Defendant Starkeisha Sharnay Jester's Answer to Complaint, with proof of service Filed by Starkeisha Sharnay Jester. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Mon 03/25 1:05 PM
Order Granting Stipulation and ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant to File Her Answer to Complaint from March 18, 2024 to March 25, 2024. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/25/2024 (KR6)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, March 22, 2024
8 8 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 03/22 6:10 PM
Stipulation By Starkeisha Sharnay Jester and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Her Answer To Complaint Related [+] Filed by Defendant Starkeisha Sharnay Jester (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-] -Filed To Correct Signature Page
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 03/22 1:28 PM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Defendant Starkeisha Sharnay Jester Related [+]. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation By Starkeisha Sharnay Jester and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Her Answer To Complaint, with proof of service Filed by Defendant Starkeisha Sharnay Jester filed by Defendant Starkeisha Sharnay Jester
6 6 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 03/22 1:22 PM
Stipulation By Starkeisha Sharnay Jester and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Her Answer To Complaint, with proof of service Filed by Defendant Starkeisha Sharnay Jester (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
5 5 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 02/16 5:46 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Berger, Michael. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
4 4 misc Proof of service Thu 02/15 3:41 PM
Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California Related [+]. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued,3 Notice
3 3 notice Notice Thu 02/15 3:34 PM
Notice of Compliance with Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 Filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California. (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 02/15 1:39 PM
Summons Issued on Starkeisha Sharnay Jester Date Issued 2/15/2024, Answer Due 3/18/2024 Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 4/17/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff University Of Southern California
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/15 10:30 AM
Adversary case 6:24-ap-01014. Complaint by University Of Southern California against Starkeisha Sharnay Jester. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)) (Nassiri, Jennifer)
Related: [-]