Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Case #: 4:24-cv-03037
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 13, 2024 3:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Peter Joseph Gleason
Defendant
Karen-Nicole Knapper
Defendant
National Action Network Inc.
Defendant
Alfred Charles Sharpton, Jr.
Plaintiff
Kevin Rogers
538 North 24th Street Apartment 1
Lincoln, NE 68503

GPO Feb 27 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 02, 2025
6 6 order Reassignment Order Thu 01/02 12:41 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER (TEXT ONLY) In the interest of judicial economy, a portion of the civil cases assigned to the Pro Se Docket will be reassigned to Senior Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition. Accordingly, this case is reassigned to Judge Gerrard for disposition and remains assigned to the Pro Se Docket for processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. [COPY MAILED TO PRO SE PARTY] (JLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/27 12:47 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04 Thu 02/15 3:03 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) Thu 02/15 3:03 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/15 2:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kevin Rogers. (LKO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Pro Se Thu 02/15 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Peter Joseph Gleason, Karen-Nicole Knapper, National Action Network Inc., and Alfred Charles Sharpton, Jr. filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Kevin Rogers. (LKO)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Attachment - Continued Thu 02/15 3:02 PM
ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED 8 DISCS MAINTAINED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Attachment No. 1) regarding Complaint - Pro Se1 . (LKO)
Related: [-]