Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00007
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2024 2:26 AM EST
defendant
Richard Anthony Reyna Densmore (1)
Represented By
James Stevenson Fisher
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam Barrett Townshend
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 3:05 AM EST
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
1 1 8 pgs INDICTMENT as to Richard Anthony Reyna Densmore (pjw) Modified text on 1/31/2024 (sjc).
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (pjw) Modified text on 1/31/2024 (sjc).
Related: [-]
4 4 PENALTY SHEET re Sealed Indictment1 as to Richard Anthony Reyna Densmore (pjw) Modified text on 1/31/2024 (sjc).
Related: [-]