California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00232
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 11:38 PM PST
Defendant
Fernando Morales Arriaga (1)
Represented By
Gary Paul Burcham
Burcham And Zugman
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Kenneth Greene
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Jun 20 2024
JUDGMENT as to Fernando Morales Arriaga (1), Count(s) 1-2, Government's oral motion to dismiss without prejudice - Granted; Count(s) 1s, Custody of the BOP: 18 Months; Supervised Release: 3 Years; Penalty Assessment: $100 at $25 per quarter through the IFRP; Fine: Waived. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (rfm)

Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 2:51 AM PST
Monday, January 15, 2024
Arrest of Fernando Morales Arriaga (no document attached) (acc) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Fernando Morales Arriaga.(acc) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Fernando Morales Arriaga: Initial Appearance set for 1/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel Kenneth Greene appearing for USA. (Greene, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Kenneth Greene added to party USA(pty:pla) (ggv). [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Fernando Morales Arriaga (cxl) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Fernando Morales Arriaga held on 1/16/2024. Appointed Attorney Gary Paul Burcham f(n/a)or Fernando Morales Arriaga. Governmen oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 1/19/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 1/30/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Arraignment set for 2/13/24 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.)(Interpreter Mylene Green). (CD# 1/16/2024 VET 24-1:5:04-5:40). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Cassidy Heverling FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Fernando Morales Arriaga (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
7 7 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Fernando Morales Arriaga. (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Fernando Morales Arriaga: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 1/16/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Detention Hearing as to Fernando Morales Arriaga held on 1/19/2024. USA oral motion for detention; motion denied as to Fernando Morales Arriaga. Bond set as to Fernando Morales Arriaga (1) $20,000 P/S sec by 1FRRA. Preliminary Hearing not held as to Fernando Morales Arriaga. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 2/13/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (Interpreter Daniel Novoa). (CD# 1/19/2024 VET 24 10:16-10:27). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Gary Burcham, CJA). (no document attached) (bas1) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Fernando Morales Arriaga (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 01/19/2024. (ggv) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
11 11 P/S Bond Filed as to Fernando Morales Arriaga in amount of $ 20,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 01/25/2024. (Document applicable to USA, Fernando Morales Arriaga.) (bas1) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
12 12 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Fernando Morales Arriaga re11 Bond. (bas1) [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Read Receipt
Monday, February 05, 2024
13 13 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Greene, Daniel) (ggv). [3:24-mj-00133-VET]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
14 14 INFORMATION as to Fernando Morales Arriaga (1) count(s) 1-2. (bas1)
Related: [-]
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Arraignment on Information as to Fernando Morales Arriaga (1) Count 1-2 held on 2/13/2024. Defendant present in court on bond. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 3/18/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. (CD# 2/13/2024 VET 24 1:41-1:47). (Plaintiff Attorney Calen Bennett, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Gary Burcham, CJA). (bas1)
Related: [-]
16 16 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Fernando Morales Arriaga (no document attached) (bas1)
Related: [-]