California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-00549
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 15, 2024 11:21 PM PST
Defendant
David Salinas-Cuevas (1)
Represented By
Julian Andree Bugarin
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Sandra Guadalupe Lopez-Garcia
Represented By
Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick
Attorney Sarah Garrick
contact info
Material Witness
Mauricio Alfonso Palestino-Sanchez
Represented By
Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick
Attorney Sarah Garrick
contact info
Material Witness
Mireya Serafin-Angel
Represented By
Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick
Attorney Sarah Garrick
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Parker Gardner-Erickson
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 12:00 AM PST
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
Arrest of David Salinas-Cuevas (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to David Salinas-Cuevas.(fjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick for Mireya Serafin-Angel, Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick for Sandra Guadalupe Lopez-Garcia, Sarah Ann Nicole Garrick for Mauricio Alfonso Palestino-Sanchez appointed. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to David Salinas-Cuevas: Initial Appearance set for 2/14/2024 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Parker Gardner-Erickson appearing for USA. (Gardner-Erickson, Parker)Attorney Parker Gardner-Erickson added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc).
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to David Salinas-Cuevas held on 2/14/2024. Financial affidavit submitted. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for David Salinas-Cuevas. Bond set as to David Salinas-Cuevas (1) $10,000 P/S secured by defendant's sig + 1 FRRA + $1,000 cash deposit. Preliminary Hearing set for 2/27/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Goddard. Arraignment set for 3/12/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Goddard. Rule 5 advisal provided; order to follow. (Interpreter Salvador Castellanos). (CD# 2/14/2024 AHG 243-325). (Plaintiff Attorney Joel Doolin, AUSA s/a). (Defendant Attorney Daniela Muehleisen, FD). (dls)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to David Salinas-Cuevas (no document attached) (dls)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for David Salinas-Cuevas (1) $10,000 P/S secured by defendant's signature + 1 FRRA + $1,000 cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/14/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Salinas-Cuevas (cxl)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to David Salinas-Cuevas: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/14/24. (ecf)
Related: [-]