Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00036
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2024 2:18 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Altavious Powell (1)
Terminated: 02/14/2024


Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 2:55 AM EST
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION documents for Supervised Release received as to Altavious Powell from Southern District of Florida.(EAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Indictment,
Att: 3 Judgment,
Att: 4 Amended Judgment