Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-00246
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2024 1:23 AM CST
Defendant
Marco Angel Guzman (1)
Represented By
Christina Lee Conway-Navarro
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Roberto Lopez, Jr.
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 2:04 AM CST
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
Arrest of Marco Angel Guzman, filed. (KarenLLopez, 7)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Marco Angel Guzman held on 2/14/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived the Preliminary Hearing. Government moved for temporary detention and continuance to prepare for detention hearing. Court granted. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Detention Hearing set for 2/14/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Devin Walker, AUSA; Vanessa Mendoza, AFPD. (USPO: Alicia Trevino) (ERO: Ricardo Rodriguez) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Maria Barrett, not used) (DUSM: Maritza Pena). (DebbieFlores, 7) Modified on 2/14/2024 (DebbieFlores, 7).
Related: [-]
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Marco Angel Guzman: Detention Hearing set for 2/15/2024 at 11:30 AM in the 8th Floor Courtroom before U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. (DebbieFlores, 7)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christina Lee Conway-Navarro, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Marco Angel Guzman, filed.(Conway-Navarro, Christina)
Related: [-]
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Marco Angel Guzman (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 2/14/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (KarenLLopez, 7)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Marco Angel Guzman, filed.(KarenLLopez, 7)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Marco Angel Guzman (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Marco Angel Guzman. Detention Hearing set for 2/13/2024 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7)
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Marco Angel Guzman. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (DebbieFlores, 7)
Related: [-]
6 6 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Marco Angel Guzman. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (SamanthaMedina, 7)
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Marco Angel Guzman, filed.
Related: [-]