Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00299
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2024 1:27 AM CST
Defendant
Jake Allen Wynn (1)
Represented By
Minerva Torres
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tyler Andrew Fleming
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 2:10 AM CST
Sunday, January 21, 2024
Arrest of Jake Allen Wynn (drda) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Jake Allen Wynn. (drda) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jake Allen Wynn. (drda) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Jake Allen Wynn. (drda) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Jake Allen Wynn. (drda) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Jake Allen Wynn (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Jake Allen Wynn (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Jake Allen Wynn held on 1/23/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/26/2024 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, Interpreter NOT required as to Jake Allen Wynn (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jake Allen Wynn; Attorney Minerva Torres for Jake Allen Wynn appointed.. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
5 5 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Jake Allen Wynn (Torres, Minerva) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS by Jake Allen Wynn (Torres, Minerva) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Jake Allen Wynn. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (bot1) [2:24-mj-00196-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
8 8 2 pgs INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jake Allen Wynn (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
10 10 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jake Allen Wynn (bot1)
Related: [-]