South Carolina District Court
Judge:Timothy M Cain
Referred: Kevin Mcdonald
Case #: 7:24-cv-00810
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Case in other court:Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, 2023-CP-04-00180
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 13, 2024 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
R&E Automated Systems, LLC
Represented By
William H Foster, III
Littler Mendelson (sc)
contact info
Maureen Rouse-Ayoub
Varnum LLP
contact info
Benjamin Tradd Hepner
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Floyd R Smith
Represented By
Jeremy R. Summerlin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Tue 02/11 10:31 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy M Cain on 2/11/25. (kmca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 12/02 10:51 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/21/24. (agig)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/21 12:18 PM
CONSENT THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/20/2025, Discovery due by 2/20/2025, Mediation Due by 3/13/2025, Motions due by 4/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/21/24. (agig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Wed 11/20 4:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by R&E Automated Systems, LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Hepner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/13 1:59 PM
CONSENT SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/22/2024, Discovery due 11/22/24, Mediation Due by 12/13/2024, Motions due by 1/10/2025, other deadlines as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/13/24. (pbri, ) Modified on 8/13/2024 to include discovery deadline (pbri, )
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 08/13 1:54 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 22 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/13/24.(pbri, )
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/13 11:55 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Scheduling Order, by R&E Automated Systems, LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/27/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Hepner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/30 11:19 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 19 the unopposed motion to admit Maureen Rouse-Ayoub pro hac vice as counsel for defendant R & E Automated Systems, LLC. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/30/24.(pbri, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Mon 07/29 4:38 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Maureen P. Rouse-Ayoub ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11903677) by R&E Automated Systems, LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Foster, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application for PHV - Maureen P. Rouse-Ayoub,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 28, 2024
18 18 order Confidentiality Order Thu 03/28 2:15 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/28/24. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order Thu 03/28 2:14 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 14 Consent Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/28/24.(rweb, )
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/28 2:10 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/18/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/20/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/20/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/19/2024, Discovery due by 8/19/2024, Motions due by 9/24/2024, Mediation Due by 9/3/2024. All other dates as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/28/24. (rweb, )
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 03/28 2:02 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by R&E Automated Systems, LLC.(Hepner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Confidentiality Order Thu 03/28 12:52 PM
Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by R&E Automated Systems, LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Hepner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Thu 03/28 12:47 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by R&E Automated Systems, LLC.(Hepner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 03/28 12:45 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by R&E Automated Systems, LLC.(Hepner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 03/28 9:02 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Floyd R Smith.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/22 9:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/14/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/28/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 3/28/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/18/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/20/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/20/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/20/2024, Discovery due by 8/19/2024, Mediation Due by 9/3/2024, Motions due by 9/24/2024, other deadlines as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/22/24. (pbri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/21 4:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by R&E Automated Systems, LLC.(Foster, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 02/16 2:39 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Floyd R Smith.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Other Fri 02/16 10:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories (including section H) are due fourteen (14) days after removal . Notice of Removals: Federal Rule 81.C.2. A defendant who did not answer before removal must answer or present other defenses or objections under these rules within the longest of these periods: (C) seven (7) days after the notice of removal is filed. (pbri, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 02/16 9:34 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by R&E Automated Systems, LLC.(pbri, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 02/16 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-CP 04-00180 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11594863), filed by R&E Automated Systems, LLC.(pbri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State summons and complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service