Blalock v. Kirkland's Stores, Inc.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Summer L Speight |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00112 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Chesterfield County Circuit Court, CL24-249 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:04 PM EDT |
Defendant
Kirkland's Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Presha Blalock
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
![]() ORDER (Acknowledging Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice)- This matter comes before the Court on a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed jointly by the Parties pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ECF No.43 .) The Court hereby acknowledges the voluntary dismissal of this action with prejudice and DIRECTS the Clerks Office to close the case. The case is now CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 11/12/2024. (adun, ) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. (Lonas, Carl) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 10/17 9:17 AM
Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Telephonically before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. (smej, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
![]() ORDER (Scheduling Status Call)- On October 14, 2024, the parties filed a joint Notice of Settlement in this matter. (ECF No.41 .) Pursuant to paragraph 4 of the Initial Pretrial Order (ECF No.15 ), the Court schedules this matter for a telephonic status hearing on Thursday, November 14, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall jointly contact chambers at the time of the scheduled status hearing. If the parties enter a stipulation of dismissal prior to November 14, 2024, the status hearing will be automatically canceled by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 10/16/2024. (adun, ) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by Kirkland's Stores, Inc. (Roberts, Rebecca) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
![]() Proposed Jury Instructions by Kirkland's Stores, Inc..(Lonas, Carl) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() NOTICE by Kirkland's Stores, Inc. of Proposed Final Pretrial Order(Lonas, Carl) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
36 | 36
![]() EXHIBIT Objected To by Presha Blalock..(Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
35 | 35
![]() EXHIBIT Objected to by Kirkland's Stores, Inc...(Lonas, Carl) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() ORDER that the parties are DIRECTED to file copies of the proposed exhibits to which they object by Tuesday, October 8, 2024. It is so ORDERED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 10/04/2024. (Kski, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Witness and Exhibit List Witness List by Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. (Roberts, Rebecca) |
|
32 | 32
![]() Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Witness List by Presha Blalock. (Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Jesse Petterson filed by Presha Blalock. (Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Discovery Designation by Kirkland's Stores, Inc..(Lonas, Carl) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Exhibit and Witness List by Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. (Lonas, Carl) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 09/20 10:47 AM
Notice of Correction re 112 - Filing attorney reminded to use the 9-element signature block on all filings. Clerk will replace with corrected document once received. (adun, ) |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony filed by Kirkland's Stores, Inc..(Lonas, Carl) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Presha Blalock.. (Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Plaintiff's Witness List by Presha Blalock. (Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Memorandum in Support re24 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony filed by Presha Blalock. (Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
24 | 24
![]() MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony by Presha Blalock. (Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 08/22 9:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell: Settlement Conference held on 8/21/2024. (jsau, ) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() STANDING ORDER IN RE: LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7(E). Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/24/2024. (Khan, ) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Defendant Kirklands Stores, Inc.'s unopposed Motion for the Independent Physical Examination of Plaintiff Presha Blalock. (ECF No.18 .) For the reasons stated herein, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion (ECF No.18 ) and ORDERS that: 1. The physical condition of Plaintiff is in controversy in this litigation, and good cause exists to order Plaintiff to submit to a physical examination under the conditions set forth in this Order. 2. The Examination of Plaintiff shall commence on Thursday, July 18, 2024 at 1:00 pm at the Joel Bieber Law Firm located at 6806 Paragon Place, Suite 100, Richmond, VA 23230. 3. The Examination shall be conducted by Dr. Ryan Jahn of Jahn Orthopaedics. 4. The Examination may consist of an interview of Plaintiff to obtain Plaintiff's medical history, a physical examination, a review of Plaintiff's medical records, and radiological testing and studies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 7/15/24. (jsau, ) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Memorandum in Support re18 MOTION for request of independent medical examination of plaintiff filed by Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. (Lonas, Carl) |
|
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for request of independent medical examination of plaintiff by Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. (Lonas, Carl) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has RESCHEDULED the settlement conference in this case for August 21, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 5/1/2024. (jsmi, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 05/01 10:35 AM
Reset Hearing: Settlement Conference reset for 8/21/2024 at 09:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. (jsau, ) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER that the settlement conference and proceedings required by Paragraph 3 of the Scheduling Order are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Judge Colombell within five (5) days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference, which should occur at such time as Judge Colombell shall approve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 4/22/24. (mful, ) |
|
15 | 15
![]() INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2024 at 2:00 PM in Richmond Courtroom 5400 before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2024 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 5400 before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 4/22/24.(mful, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on August 13, 2024 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 4/22/24. (jsau, ) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 04/23 9:28 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/22/2024. (smej, ) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2024 at 02:30 PM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 4/12/24. (jsau, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER. Having considered the CONSENTS TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (ECF Nos.9 and10 ) executed by counsel of record, and upon consent of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that this action shall be REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight for all purposes except settlement negotiations, which are hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. It is further ORDERED that the Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled on the undersigned's docket for 11:30 a.m. April 17, 2024 is cancelled. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/9/2024. (nbrow) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/09 5:04 PM
Case REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight for all purposes except settlement, which are referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. District Judge Robert E. Payne no longer assigned to the case. (nbrow) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Presha Blalock. (Konvicka, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. (Lonas, Carl) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether the parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. To that end, counsel for the plaintiff shall assure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than April 10, 2024, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. April 11, 2024 whether such consents (by all parties) have been given; and, to avoid confusion, counsel for each party shall file, not later than 5:00 p.m. on April 11, 2024, a Statement Respecting Consent wherein the position of the party (whether consenting or not) shall be clearly set forth. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 4/1/2024. (jenjones, ) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details . It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/29/2024. (nbrow) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2024 at 11:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details . Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/29/2024. (nbrow) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Joint Discovery Plan by Kirkland's Stores, Inc..(Lonas, Carl) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Kirkland's Stores, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Kirkland's Stores, Inc..(Lonas, Carl) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Kirkland's Stores, Inc. (Lonas, Carl). Clerk replaced Citizenship Disclosure Form to include Civil Action Number on 2/16/2024. Modified on 2/16/2024. (sbea) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kirkland's Stores, Inc. (Lonas, Carl). Clerk replaced Financial Disclosure Statment to include Civil Action Number on 2/16/2024. Modified on 2/16/2024. (sbea) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $405, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-9368057), filed by Kirkland's Stores, Inc.(Lonas, Carl). Clerk replaced Notice of Removal to include Civil Action Number on 2/16/2024. Modified on 2/16/2024. (sbea) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 02/16 5:05 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 02/16 5:06 PM
Notice of Correction re:1 Notice of Removal,2 Financial Disclosure Statement,3 Citizenship Disclosure Form; Clerk changed Cause to Notice of Removal - Personal Injury rather than Diversity - Personal Injury. Clerk also added the Civil Action Number to the Notice of Removal, Financial Disclosure Statement, and the Citizenship Disclosure Form. No further action is required. (sbea) |