Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-50073

Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julie A Manning
Case #: 5:24-ap-05249
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Leading Shine Limited
Represented By
Leading Shine Limited
contact info
Defendant
Hamilton Investment Management Limited
Represented By
Hamilton Investment Management Limited
contact info
Defendant
Hamilton Opportunity Fund SPC
Represented By
Hamilton Opportunity Fund SPC
contact info
Defendant
Haoran He
Represented By
Haoran He
contact info
Defendant
Himalaya Currency Clearing Pty Ltd.
Represented By
Himalaya Currency Clearing Pty Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Himalaya International Clearing Limited
Represented By
Himalaya International Clearing Limited
contact info
Defendant
Himalaya International Financial Group Limited
Represented By
Himalaya International Financial Group Limited
contact info
Defendant
Himalaya International Payments Limited
Represented By
Himalaya International Payments Limited
contact info
Defendant
Himalaya International Reserves Limited
Represented By
Himalaya International Reserves Limited
contact info
Defendant
Jovial Century International Limited
Represented By
Jovial Century International Limited
contact info
Defendant
K Legacy Ltd.
Represented By
K Legacy Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Karin Maistrello
Represented By
Karin Maistrello
contact info
Defendant
Hamilton Capital Holding Limited
Represented By
Hamilton Capital Holding Limited
contact info
Defendant
Major Lead International Limited
Represented By
Major Lead International Limited
contact info
Defendant
Mei Guo
Represented By
Mei Guo
contact info
Defendant
Next Tycoon Investments Limited
Represented By
Next Tycoon Investments Limited
contact info
Defendant
Qiang Guo
Represented By
Qiang Guo
contact info
Defendant
Rule of Law Foundation III, Inc.
Represented By
Rule of Law Foundation III, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Rule of Law Society IV, Inc.
Represented By
Rule of Law Society IV, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Saraca Media Group, Inc.
Represented By
Saraca Media Group, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Seven Mission Group LLC
Represented By
Seven Mission Group LLC
contact info
Defendant
William Je
Represented By
William Je
contact info
Defendant
Wise Creation International Limited
Represented By
Wise Creation International Limited
contact info
Defendant
GFNY, Inc.
Represented By
GFNY, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
ACA Capital Group Ltd.
Represented By
ACA Capital Group Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Alfa Global Ventures Limited
Represented By
Alfa Global Ventures Limited
contact info
Defendant
Alfonso Global Ventures Limited
Represented By
Alfonso Global Ventures Limited
contact info
Defendant
Anton Development Limited
Represented By
Anton Development Limited
contact info
Defendant
Bravo Luck Limited
Represented By
Bravo Luck Limited
contact info
Defendant
Celestial Tide Limited
Represented By
Celestial Tide Limited
contact info
Defendant
China Golden Spring Group (Hong Kong) Ltd.
Represented By
China Golden Spring Group (Hong Kong) Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Eastern Profit Corporation Limited
Represented By
Eastern Profit Corporation Limited
contact info
Defendant
Freedom Media Ventures Limited
Represented By
Freedom Media Ventures Limited
contact info
Defendant
G Club International Limited
Represented By
G Club International Limited
contact info
Defendant
G Club Operations LLC
Represented By
G Club Operations LLC
contact info
Defendant
G Fashion (CA)
Represented By
G Fashion (CA)
contact info
Defendant
G Fashion Hold Co A Limited
Represented By
G Fashion Hold Co A Limited
contact info
Defendant
G Fashion Hold Co B Limited
Represented By
G Fashion Hold Co B Limited
contact info
Defendant
G Fashion International Limited
Represented By
G Fashion International Limited
contact info
Defendant
GFashion Media Group Inc.,
Represented By
GFashion Media Group Inc.,
contact info
Defendant
G Music LLC
Represented By
G Music LLC
contact info
Defendant
GF IP, LLC
Represented By
GF IP, LLC
contact info
Defendant
GF Italy, LLC
Represented By
GF Italy, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Despins, Luc A., Chapter 11 Trustee
Represented By
Douglass E. Barron
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 23 2025
Memorandum of Decision and Order Denying Motions to Dismiss. (Re:)114, 116 ) (rms)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
145 145 order District Court - Order Thu 05/15 11:26 AM
ORDER FROM U.S. DISTRICT COURT , Case No. 3:25-cv-00748 (KAD) (ECF No. 11) Related [+]. (dd) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings.Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/13/2025.(Samson, J)
Related: [-] 138 Notice of Appeal filed by Defendant G Club Operations LLC, Defendant G Club International Limited
144 144 order District Court - Order Thu 05/15 11:19 AM
ORDER FROM U.S. DISTRICT COURT , Case No. 3:25-cv-00747 (KAD) (ECF No. 29) Related [+] (dd) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings.Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 5/14/2025.(Samson, J)
Related: [-] 135 Notice of Appeal filed by Defendant ACA Capital Group Ltd., Defendant Celestial Tide Limited, Defendant G Fashion (CA), Defendant G Fashion Hold Co A Limited, Defendant G Fashion Hold Co B Limited, Defendant G Fashion International Limited, Defendant GF IP, LLC, Defendant GF Italy, LLC, Defendant GFNY, Inc., Defendant Hamilton Capital Holding Limited, Defendant Hamilton Investment Management Limited, Defendant Hamilton Opportunity Fund SPC, Defendant Himalaya Currency Clearing Pty Ltd., Defendant Himalaya International Clearing Limited, Defendant Himalaya International Financial Group Limited, Defendant Himalaya International Payments Limited, Defendant Himalaya International Reserves Limited, Defendant Major Lead International Limited, Defendant William Je, Defendant GFashion Media Group Inc.
Friday, May 09, 2025
143 143 appeal Notice of Docketing Notice of Appeal and/or Motion for Leave Fri 05/09 3:40 PM
Notice and Acknowledgement of Docketing Notice of Appeal and Motion for Leave to Appeal to District Court, Case No. 3:25-cv-00748(VDO) Related [+] (kg)
Related: [-] 138 Notice of Appeal.
142 142 appeal Notice of Docketing Notice of Appeal and/or Motion for Leave Fri 05/09 3:37 PM
Notice and Acknowledgement of Docketing Notice of Appeal and Motion for Leave to Appeal to U.S. District Court, Case No. 3:25-cv-00747(VDO) Related [+] (kg)
Related: [-] 135 Notice of Appeal.
141 141 appeal Transmittal re: Appeal and/or related documents Fri 05/09 12:14 PM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Motion for Leave of Appeal to U.S. District Court Related [+]
Related: [-] 138 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal #3 Memorandum in Support Motion for Leave #4 Memorandum of Decision and Order #5 Order Correcting Memo of Decision)(kg
140 140 appeal Transmittal re: Appeal and/or related documents Fri 05/09 12:10 PM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Motion for Leave of Appeal to U.S. District Court Related [+]
Related: [-] 135 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal #3 Memorandum of Decision and Order #4 Order Correcting Memo of Decision)(kg