Despins v. Lamp Capital LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-50073
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-50073
Connecticut Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Julie A Manning |
Case #: | 5:24-ap-05275 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Rule of Law Society IV Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G Fashion International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Saraca Media Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Himalaya International Reserves Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Himalaya International Financial Group Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Himalaya Currency Clearing Pty Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hamilton Capital Holding Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hamilton Opportunity Fund SPC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hamilton Investment Management Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ACA Capital Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GF Italy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
China Golden Spring Group (Hong Kong) Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Himalaya International Clearing Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anton Development Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GFNY Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rule of Law Foundation III Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G Fashion Media Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G Fashion
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G Club Operations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G Club International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leading Shine NY Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hudson Diamond NY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lexington Property and Staffing Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HCHK Property Management Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HCHK Technologies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greenwich Land LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Golden Spring (New York) Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lamp Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luc A. Despins
Paul Hastings LLP 200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Notice of Filing Motion to Extend Deadline to File Avoidance Actions and Notice of Hearing Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Notice of Entry of Order Temporarily Staying Discovery Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, October 23, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearances . (sr) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Motion to Withdraw Appearance for Lee Vartan, Esq., Sam Della Fera, Jr., Esq., Thomas M. Walsh, Esq., and Melissa Wernick, Esq. Filed by Lee Vartan on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd., Defendants . (Vartan, Lee) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 21, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd. Defendants, . (Kindseth, Stephen) |
|
30 | 30
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by James M. Moriarty on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd. Defendants, . (Moriarty, James) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/21 12:19 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE WITHOUT PREJUDICE: On October 8, 2024, Attorneys Lee Vartan, Sam Della Fera, Jr., Melissa Falk Wernick, and Thomas M. Walsh of the law firm Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC moved (the 'Motion') to withdraw their appearances for defendants Leading Shine NY Ltd. ('Leading Shine') and Hudson Diamond NY LLC ('HDNY'). (ECF No. 26.) The Motion asserts attorneys at the law firm Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. represent Leading Shine and HDNY. The docket of this adversary proceeding does not reflect any such appearances on behalf of Leading Shine and HDNY. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED: The Motion is denied without prejudice to refiling after appearances are filed for Leading Shine and HDNY. Signed by Judge Julie A. Manning on October 21, 2024. (lw) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Notice of Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Notice of Amending and Staying Discovery Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Motion to Withdraw Appearance for Lee Vartan, Esq., Sam Della Fera, Jr., Esq., Thomas M. Walsh, Esq., and Melissa Wernick, Esq. Filed by Lee Vartan on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd., Defendants . (Vartan, Lee) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Bryan Ha on behalf of Rule of Law Foundation III Inc., Rule of Law Society IV Inc. Defendants, . (Ha, Bryan) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Entry of Notice of Hearing Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Filing Supplemental Motion to Extend Time to File Avoidance Actions Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Order Granting Motion for Admission of Visiting Attorney Bryan Ha . (sds) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Entry of Avoidance and Mediation Procedures Order Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Jon P. Newton on behalf of Rule of Law Foundation III Inc. Defendant, . (Newton, Jon) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Jon P. Newton on behalf of Rule of Law Society IV Inc. Defendant, . (Newton, Jon) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Melissa I Falk Wernick on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd. Defendants, . (Falk Wernick, Melissa) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Thomas M. Walsh on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd. Defendants, . (Walsh, Thomas) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Sam Della Fera Jr on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd. Defendants, . (Della Fera, Sam) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Lee Vartan on behalf of Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd. Defendants, . (Vartan, Lee) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Second Revised Proposed Order Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Stipulation with Greenwich Land LLC Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint . Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Austin D Kim on behalf of Greenwich Land LLC Defendant, . (Kim, Austin) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Christopher J. Major on behalf of Greenwich Land LLC Defendant, . (Major, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion for Order Modifying Avoidance Action Procedures to Include Procedures for Mediation of Avoidance Actions. Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins, Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance Filed by Douglas S. Skalka on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff, . (Skalka, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Avoidance Procedures Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued on Defendant(s) ACA Capital Limited, Anton Development Limited, China Golden Spring Group (Hong Kong) Ltd, G Club International Limited, G Club Operations LLC, G Fashion, G Fashion International Limited, G Fashion Media Group Inc., GF Italy LLC, GFNY Inc., Golden Spring (New York) Limited, Greenwich Land LLC, HCHK Property Management Inc., HCHK Technologies Inc., Hamilton Capital Holding Ltd, Hamilton Investment Management Ltd, Hamilton Opportunity Fund SPC, Himalaya Currency Clearing Pty Ltd, Himalaya International Clearing Ltd., Himalaya International Financial Group Ltd, Himalaya International Reserves Ltd, Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Lamp Capital LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd., Lexington Property and Staffing Inc., Rule of Law Foundation III Inc., Rule of Law Society IV Inc., Saraca Media Group Inc. 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Luc A. Despins). (gr) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Sealed Document Filed. Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins Plaintiff . (Linsey, Patrick) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-05275 Complaint (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Luc A. Despins against Lamp Capital LLC, Golden Spring (New York) Limited, Greenwich Land LLC, HCHK Technologies Inc., HCHK Property Management Inc., Lexington Property and Staffing Inc., Hudson Diamond NY LLC, Leading Shine NY Ltd., G Club International Limited, G Club Operations LLC, G Fashion, G Fashion Media Group Inc., Rule of Law Foundation III Inc., Rule of Law Society IV Inc., GFNY Inc., Anton Development Limited, Himalaya International Clearing Ltd., China Golden Spring Group (Hong Kong) Ltd, GF Italy LLC, ACA Capital Limited, Hamilton Investment Management Ltd, Hamilton Opportunity Fund SPC, Hamilton Capital Holding Ltd, Himalaya Currency Clearing Pty Ltd, Himalaya International Financial Group Ltd, Himalaya International Reserves Ltd, Saraca Media Group Inc., G Fashion International Limited. Receipt #Deferred Fee Amount $350. Fee Deferred. (Linsey, Patrick) |