Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Myong J Joun
Case #: 1:24-cv-10383
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1218(2) Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:09 PM EDT
Defendant
RSPE Audio Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff
Arnold Vargas
Represented By
Jason M. Leviton
Block & Leviton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 11, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/11 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arnold Vargas (Leviton, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
6 6 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Mon 03/18 4:32 PM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/18 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Arnold Vargas (Leviton, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/06 3:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Arnold Vargas. RSPE Audio Solutions, Inc. served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Arnold Vargas. (Leviton, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 02/16 3:58 PM
Summons Issued as to RSPE Audio Solutions, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 02/16 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/16 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against RSPE Audio Solutions, Inc. Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10273392 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Arnold Vargas.(Leviton, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form