North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas D Schroeder
Referred: L Patrick Auld
Case #: 1:24-cv-00117
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:58 PM EDT
Defendant
MUTUAL OF OMAHA MORTGAGE, INC
Defendant
OCCANEECHIBAND OF THE SAPONI NATION
Defendant
TRUSTEE SERVICES OF CAROLINA, LLC, SUBSTITUTE TRUSTEE
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff
ZILDJIAN POTTER
831 ROYAL OAK LN
MEBANE, NC 27302


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 27, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/27 3:54 PM
ORDER that, not having demonstrated good cause why such service was not made within the period, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Defendants. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 06/27/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Judge Thu 06/27 10:00 AM
CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE:5 Notice to Plaintiff of Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days as to all defendants. (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 notice Failure to Make Service Letter Mon 06/10 10:11 AM
Notice to Plaintiff of Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days as to all defendants. (ae)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Fri 02/16 4:57 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion for TRO as set out herein Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 02/16/2024. (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 02/16 12:25 PM
MOTION entitled EMERGENCY EXPARTE MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINIG ORDER by ZILDJIAN POTTER. Response to Motion due by 3/8/2024(al)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/16 12:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (al)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/16 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ZILDJIAN POTTER.(al)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 EXHIBIT B
misc Receipt of Funds Fri 02/16 1:37 PM
Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 405.00 Related [+] (al)
Related: [-] ceipt #3826
utility Motions Submitted Fri 02/16 2:17 PM
Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER:3 MOTION entitled EMERGENCY EXPARTE MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINIG ORDER by ZILDJIAN POTTER. (ae)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned Thu 02/22 8:48 AM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (al)
Related: [-]