Texas Western District Court
Judge:Susan Hightower
Case #: 1:24-cv-00162
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:53rd Judicial District Court, Travis County, TX, D-1-GN-23-009182
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 11:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.
Represented By
Jeremiah J. Wood
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
James E. Phillips
Baker And Hostetler, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Jason Harries
Represented By
G. Brad Riffe
The Riffe Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info

GPO May 01 2024
gned by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/17/2024. Si

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
26 26 order Judgment Thu 02/20 4:37 PM
Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cnr)
Related: [-]
25 25 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Strike Thu 02/20 4:34 PM
Order Granting Defendant Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.'s19 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Defendant Aston Martin Lagonda of North America Inc.'s23 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
24 24 respm Surreply to Motion Thu 01/23 5:47 PM
Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Mark Jason Harries, re23 MOTION to Strike and reply in support of motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc. Reply to Motion to Strike and Sur Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Riffe, G.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
23 23 motion Strike Thu 01/16 2:21 PM
MOTION to Strike and reply in support of motion for summary judgment by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.. (Wood, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
22 22 respm Response to Motion Thu 01/09 3:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Mark Jason Harries, re19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.(Riffe, G.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 adr ADR Report - Other Mon 12/16 4:10 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Mark Jason Harries(Riffe, G.)
Related: [-]
20 20 adr ADR Report - Other Mon 12/16 3:47 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.(Wood, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Fri 12/13 3:05 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc..(Wood, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, June 07, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/07 4:58 PM
AMENDED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 3/31/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Susan Hightower, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Hightower, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/16/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2024, Discovery due by 11/1/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 12/13/2024. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 06/07 11:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Hightower for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
16 16 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Thu 06/06 7:28 AM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.. (Wood, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 06/05 1:46 PM
ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant file a Notice Concerning Reference to United State Magistrate Judge on or before June 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/04 9:20 AM
AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 5/22/2024, Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/16/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2024, Discovery due by 11/4/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2024, Motions due by 12/13/2024. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 06/03 4:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Hightower: Initial Pretrial Conference held by Phone on 6/3/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter AT&T Conf Line.)(pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 05/15 3:09 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by Telephone. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
utility Notice of Correction Mon 05/13 10:48 AM
Notice of Correction: re11 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Your filing includes a Proposed Scheduling Order and a Notice Concerning Reference to US Magistrate Judge. These documents should have been filed separately. The clerk has modified your entry using the correct event. No additional action will be required at this time. Please take note for future filing purposes. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
11 11 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 05/10 9:46 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Mark Jason Harries. (Riffe, G.)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/13 10:44 AM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Jason Harries (contained within11 Proposed Scheduling Order ) (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Wed 05/01 4:40 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/17/2024. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 1:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremiah J. Wood for Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/04 1:38 PM
Proposed Order to7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Phillips for Jeremiah J. Wood ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number BTXWDC-18482292) by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.. (Phillips, James)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Mon 03/04 12:57 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Phillips for Jeremiah J. Wood . A Proposed Order is required when a non-dispositive Motion is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "PROPOSED ORDER" event from the Other Documents/Other Filings menu/submenu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion.(pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/01 2:39 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Phillips for Jeremiah J. Wood ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number BTXWDC-18482292) by on behalf of Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.. (Phillips, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
6 6 misc Supplement to Fri 02/16 4:34 PM
SUPPLEMENT to3 Deficiency Notice, Civil Cover Sheet by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.. (Phillips, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/16 4:06 PM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order to File Pro Hac Motion Fri 02/16 4:05 PM
Order Directing Jeremiah J. Wood to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency Notice Fri 02/16 4:04 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal, the Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because you did not attach the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 02/16 3:30 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aston Martin Lagonda Group Limited, Other Affiliate Aston Martin Lagonda Global Holdings plc for Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc.. (Phillips, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/16 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-18429210), filed by Aston Martin Lagonda of North America, Inc..(Phillips, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/16 4:03 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 02/16 4:03 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]