Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John S Hodge
Case #: 5:24-bk-10178
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Feb 14, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Gulf South Energy Services, LLC
1843 Grimmett Dr
Shreveport, LA 71107-5307
Represented By
Robert W. Raley
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
DIP
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101

GPO Feb 14 2025
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Before Confirmation (Re: 279 Chapter 11 Plan) Filed on 2/14/2025 (troy)

Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
295 295 notice Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served Wed 05/14 10:37 AM
Amended Reserved Hearing (Served) Related [+], IF AND ONLY IF Objection, A Hearing Will Be Held, 06/18/2025, 10:00 AM, at Courtroom Four, Shreveport with Certificate of Service . Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Gulf South Energy Services, LLC (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-] 292 Objection to Claim,293 Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served
294 294 notice Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served Wed 05/14 10:30 AM
Amended Reserved Hearing (Served) Related [+], IF AND ONLY IF Objection, A Hearing Will Be Held, 06/18/2025, 10:00 AM, at Courtroom Four, Shreveport with Certificate of Service . Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Gulf South Energy Services, LLC (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-] 290 Objection to Claim,291 Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
293 293 notice Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served Tue 05/13 3:31 PM
Reserved Hearing (Served) Related [+], IF AND ONLY IF Objection, A Hearing Will Be Held, 06/11/2025, 10:00 AM, at Courtroom Four, Shreveport with Certificate of Service . Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Gulf South Energy Services, LLC (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-] 292 Objection to Claim
292 292 answer Objection to Claim Tue 05/13 3:28 PM
Objection to Claim Number 50 by RWLS LLC d/b/a Renegade Services, in the amount of $ 72,754.00 . Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Gulf South Energy Services, LLC (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
291 291 notice Hearing Notice, IF AND ONLY IF Objections Served Tue 05/13 3:24 PM
Reserved Hearing (Served) Related [+], IF AND ONLY IF Objection, A Hearing Will Be Held, 06/11/2025, 10:00 AM, at Courtroom Four, Shreveport with Certificate of Service . Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Gulf South Energy Services, LLC (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-] 290 Objection to Claim
290 290 answer Objection to Claim Tue 05/13 3:20 PM
Objection to Claim Number 49 by Pinnacle Bank, in the amount of $ 76,450.35 . Filed by Robert W. Raley on behalf of Gulf South Energy Services, LLC (Raley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order