Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 1:24-cv-00072
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Case in other court:Tennessee Middle, 3:24-cv-00129
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:25 PM EDT
Defendant
Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By
J Craig Oliver
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp (nashville)
contact info
Joshua Douglas Kleppin
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Matthew C Lonergan
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Charles J Mataya
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
John P Rodgers
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Defendant
Community Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By
J Craig Oliver
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp (nashville)
contact info
Joshua Douglas Kleppin
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Matthew C Lonergan
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Charles J Mataya
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
John P Rodgers
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Foust
Represented By
William M. Hogg
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Michael A. Josephson
Josephson Dunlap, LLP
contact info
Clif Clifton Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Clif Alexander
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Michael Josephson
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Blayne Fisher
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Austin W. Anderson
Anderson Alexander, PLLC
contact info
Melody Fowler-Green
Yezbak Law Offices PLLC
contact info
N. Chase Teeples
Yezbak Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Andrew W. Dunlap
Josephson Dunlap, LLP
contact info
Andrew Dunlap
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Nicholas Chase Teeples
Yezbak Law Offices PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
42 42 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 6:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Case with Prejudice by Sarah Foust. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
41 41 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 9:51 AM
ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 03/25/2025. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
40 40 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/24 11:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5944339.) by Sarah Foust. (Hastings, Carter)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Mon 03/24 12:48 PM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5944339.) filed by Sarah Foust as to Sarah Foust (SAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/18 4:36 PM
NOTICE by Sarah Foust of Filing Notice of Consents(Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consents
Monday, May 20, 2024
38 38 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 05/20 5:06 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
37 37 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 05/13 10:00 AM
Now before the Court is the Joint Motion to Extend Time for Parties to File Joint Discovery Plan [Doc. 36]. In light of the parties' agreement, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 36] . The parties SHALL file their discovery report on or before May 20, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 5/13/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 05/10 6:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Discovery Plan by Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc.. (Lonergan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Tue 04/23 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate Judge by Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc. (Lonergan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File Consent/Non-Consent Tue 04/23 8:28 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (CNC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
34 34 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/15 9:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/23/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/15/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/09 7:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Douglas Kleppin on behalf of All Defendants (Kleppin, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Thu 03/28 3:45 PM
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Braddy and Blayne Fisher terminated. (Alexander, Clif)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
31 31 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/19 1:09 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lauren Elizabeth Braddy re6 Order,8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss,7 Order Governing Depositions,9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information (ABF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
30 30 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/18 11:00 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Clif Alexander, Blayne Fisher, Lauren Braddy re24 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (AML)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/13 7:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J Craig Oliver on behalf of All Defendants (Oliver, J)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/13 7:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John P Rodgers on behalf of All Defendants (Rodgers, John)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/13 7:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Mataya on behalf of All Defendants (Mataya, Charles)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/13 5:04 PM
ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 03/13/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Wed 03/13 9:53 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William C. Alexander ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5621361.) filed by Sarah Foust (DCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/12 4:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William C. Alexander ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5621361.) by Sarah Foust. (Alexander, Clif)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Tue 03/12 3:44 PM
Second and Final NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) re Clif Clifton Alexander, Blayne Fisher and Lauren Elizabeth Braddy. Mailed to Alexander, Fisher and Braddy. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/11 2:38 PM
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 03/11/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/11 2:35 PM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 03/11/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/11 2:33 PM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 03/11/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Fri 03/08 10:04 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Sarah Foust, 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Sarah Foust, 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Sarah Foust (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/08 10:03 AM
MOTION for William Hogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #300003383.) by Sarah Foust. (ABF)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/08 10:02 AM
MOTION for Michael Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #300003383.) by Sarah Foust. (ABF)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/08 10:00 AM
MOTION for Andrew Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #300003383.) by Sarah Foust. (ABF)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/07 3:48 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 03/07/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Thu 03/07 8:30 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/7/2024. (AML)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/06 6:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc..(Lonergan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Wed 03/06 8:08 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5614811.) filed by Sarah Foust (AML)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Tue 03/05 6:42 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent Hallmark Healthcare Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Cleveland Hospital Company, LLC for Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC. (Lonergan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Tue 03/05 6:40 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Community Health Systems, Inc.. (Lonergan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/05 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C Lonergan on behalf of All Defendants (Lonergan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 5:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5614811.) by Sarah Foust. (Anderson, Austin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/04 12:09 PM
Now before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Original Collective Action/Class Action Complaint [Doc. 5]. In light of no objection, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 5] . Defendants SHALL respond to the Original Collective Action/Class Action Complaint [Doc. 1] on or before March 8, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 3/4/2024. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
9 9 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Fri 03/01 10:23 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/01/2024. (copies mailed to attorneys Fisher, Braddy & Hogg) (KMK)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Fri 03/01 10:22 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/01/2024. (copies mailed to attorneys Fisher, Braddy & Hogg) (KMK)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Fri 03/01 10:21 AM
Order Governing Depositions - Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/01/2024. (copies mailed to attorneys Fisher, Braddy & Hogg) (KMK)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/01 9:50 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER - Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned cases are related to Wells v. Community Health Systems, Inc., et al., No. 3:24-CV-68. For purposes of judicial efficiency and in light of the similar nature of the cases, involving one or more of the same parties, the undersigned finds that a related-case order is appropriate. Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin, this case will also be assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin. However, consolidation is not ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 3/01/2024. (KMK) Modified on 3/1/2024 (KMK)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 03/01 10:20 AM
District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (KMK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Fri 03/01 10:26 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC and Community Health Systems, Inc. (KMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/29 6:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc.. (Lonergan, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Tue 02/20 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac).(SAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Deficiency cont.
Friday, February 16, 2024
3 3 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 02/16 3:09 PM
Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:24-cv-00129.
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
2 2 ORDER: By previous order (Doc. No. 163 in Case No. 3:21-cv-00865), the Court granted the unopposed motion to sever certain Opt-in Plaintiffs into separate cases and transfer those cases to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. Before transfer, the parties were given 30 days to file amended and supplemental pleadings. Amended complaints have now been filed. Accordingly, the Opt-in Plaintiffs are severed into seven groupings as separate cases based upon Plaintiffs' residences, as follows: 1) Clarksville, (2) Cleveland, (3) Jefferson City, (4) North Knoxville, (5) Newport, (6) LaFollette, and (7) Turkey Creek. The Clerk is directed to open a separate case for each of the six groupings, waive the filing fee in each new case, and then transfer the cases to the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/2/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/16/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Cleveland Tennessee Hospital Company, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc. (Filing fee is waived per Order2 ), filed by Sarah Foust.(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/16/2024.]
Related: [-]