In re: Subpoena Directed to Sandeep Sahota by Crowe LLP
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:24-mc-80040 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 03/13 3:00 PM
Case electronically transferred to the District of Vermont (slh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Tue 03/12 7:43 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 6 Motion to Transfer Case. This is a motion to quash a subpoena under Federal Rule of Procedure 45. The underlying litigation is pending in the District of Vermont. Both parties consent to transfer the motion to the District of Vermont. Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) ("When the court where compliance is required did not issue the subpoena, it may transfer a motion under [Rule 45] to the issuing court if the person subject to the subpoena consents or if the court finds exceptional circumstances."); see, e.g., Hall v. Marriott Int'l Inc., No. 21-MC-80165-TSH, 2021 WL 3129598, at *1-2 (N.D. Cal. July 23, 2021) ("[W]hether to transfer a subpoena-related motion is committed to the discretion of the court where compliance is required."). The court thus grants 6 Motion to Transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Vermont. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Subpoena filed bySandeep Sahota.(Coffin, Tristram) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed bySandeep Sahota. (Coffin, Tristram) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sandeep Sahota.. (Coffin, Tristram) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to the Motion to Quash the Subpoena filed byCrowe LLP.(Infelise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Crowe LLP.. (Infelise, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Order. Signed 2/27/2024 by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Tristram Coffin.(klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
![]() CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination to United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have filed a Motion to Quash and Motion to Transfer. Therefore Sandeep Sahota and Respondent Crow, LLP shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within seven (7) days . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 02/27 3:08 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Corrected by the clerk. No action necessary. Re:[1-6] Application for Admission Pro Hac. The pro hac should not have been included in the Motion to Quash. The pro hac should have been filed as a separate Motion for Pro Hac Vice . (klh, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/27/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer the Motion to Quash; Memorandum of Supporting Points and Authorities filed by Crowe LLP. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/11/2024. Replies due by 3/18/2024.(Infelise, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/22 7:11 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing1 MOTION to Quash set for 3/28/2024 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/1/2024. Replies due by 3/8/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 02/22 4:12 PM
ORDER. There is a motion to quash, generally on issues of venue and burden. The court has a process (see attached standing order) for a shorter approach to resolving the issues. That said, the responding party has not made an appearance yet. The court notes that the ordinary schedule is opposition due March 1, 2024, reply due March 8, 2024, and hearing date March 28, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. For now, the court sets that date and briefing schedule. If the parties confer and agree to engage in the joint letter process in the standing order, they may say so in a written submission. The court usually is able to set a hearing within a week or so after a joint letter brief. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on February 22, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Supplemental MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Tristram J. Coffin ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19138874.) filed by Sandeep Sahota.(Coffin, Tristram) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 02/20 10:39 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA against Sandeep Sahota ( Filing fee $ 52, receipt number ACANDC-19135042.). Filed by Sandeep Sahota.(Coffin, Tristram) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |