Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:24-cv-00433
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:05 PM EDT
Defendant
Blackstone Medical Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Natasha Koller
Represented By
Scott David Owens
Scott D. Owens, P.A.
contact info
Kimberly Hamel Wochholz
The Consumer Rights Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 08, 2024
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 04/08 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
11 11 order Order Fri 04/05 4:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and Plaintiff's "Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice" (Doc. 10 ), this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/5/2024. (MEJ)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Fri 04/05 12:44 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Natasha Koller (Wochholz, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Fri 04/05 12:01 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Natasha Koller (Wochholz, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Fri 03/01 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/27 4:48 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Natasha Koller. (Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of service executed Thu 02/22 11:59 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 2-22-24 by Blackstone Medical Services, LLC as to Blackstone Medical Services, LLC. (Chamberlin, Hunter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
5 5 service Summons issued Tue 02/20 4:09 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Blackstone Medical Services, LLC. (LAB)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 02/20 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Scott David Owens on behalf of Natasha Koller. Lead Counsel: Scott D Owens. (Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/20 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/20 10:45 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-00433-TPB-NHA. (JK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/16 6:55 PM
COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against Blackstone Medical Services, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21779685) filed by Natasha Koller.(Owens, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons