South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-00464
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 7:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Verde Environmental Inc
Represented By
Rita Bolt Barker
Wyche Pa (gree)
contact info
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
Royal Chemical Company
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
3M Company, The
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Plaintiff
Cobb County-Marietta Water Authority
Represented By
Michael L McGlamry
Pope Mcglamry PC
contact info
James L Ferraro, Jr
The Ferraro Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/13 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rita Bolt Barker on behalf of Verde Environmental Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-00464-RMG(Barker, Rita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 02/20 10:38 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 1/30/2024), Cobb County-Marietta Water Authority v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-00464-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Georgia (Atlanta Division) (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 02/16 10:40 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/16 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11559573.), filed by Cobb County-Marietta Water Authority. Service due by 4/29/2024(hcor, )
Related: [-]