Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Denise E Barnett
Case #: 2:24-bk-20699
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Aug 28, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Shamrock Industries, LLC
3850 Air Park St
Memphis, TN 38118-6008
Represented By
Michael P. Coury
Glankler Brown PLLC
contact info
Ricky Hutchens
Glankler Brown
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee One Memphis Place 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38103
Represented By
Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
129 129 trustee Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution F-nonconsenual plan consummated, fees awarded Mon 03/03 1:14 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 13 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Available, Assets Exempt: Not Available, Claims Scheduled: $4442061.77, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Available. (Geno, Craig)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 01, 2025
128 128 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sat 03/01 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 127 Order on Motion for Final Decree
Thursday, February 27, 2025
127 127 2 pgs order Order On Motion For Final Decree Thu 02/27 1:18 PM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree Related [+] (ams)
Related: [-] 125
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
126 126 motion Final Decree Wed 02/26 12:06 PM
THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN VOIDED. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. THIS HAS BEEN CORRECTED BY THE PARTY FILER. NO FURTHER ACTION NEEDED. Motion for Final Decree Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Shamrock Industries, LLC (Hutchens, Ricky) Modified on 2/26/2025 (ana)
Related: [-]
utility Order Due Wed 02/26 8:33 AM
An Order Granting is to be filed by Ricky L, Hutchens Related [+] Order due by 3/12/2025. (ana)
Related: [-] 125 Motion for Final Decree Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Shamrock Industries, LLC
utility Corrective Entry Wed 02/26 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY : Related [+] (ana)
Related: [-] 126 THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN VOIDED. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. THIS HAS BEEN CORRECTED BY THE PARTY FILER. NO FURTHER ACTION NEEDED. Motion for Final Decree Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Shamrock Industries, LLC (Hutchens, Ricky) Modified on 2/26/2025 (ana).
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
125 125 motion Final Decree Tue 02/25 2:12 PM
Motion for Final Decree Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Shamrock Industries, LLC (Hutchens, Ricky)
Related: [-]