Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-cr-60031
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2024 2:29 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Gilroy (1)
Represented By
Noticing FPD-FTL
contact info
Huda Ajlani Macri
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
M. Catherine Koontz
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/17/2024 3:32 AM EST
Friday, February 02, 2024
Set Hearing as to Michael Gilroy: Initial Appearance set for 2/2/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (at) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Michael Gilroy (1). (at) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to Michael Gilroy held on 2/2/2024. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 2/2/2024. Parties propose stipulated $150,000 PSB. The Court sets the matter for bond hearing. Arraignment set for 2/16/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Bond Hearing set for 2/9/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 2/16/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-FTL for Michael Gilroy (Digital 11:19:05;11:59:59) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/2/2024). (at) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender as to Michael Gilroy. Attorney Huda Ajlani Macri added. Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL terminated.. Attorney Huda Ajlani Macri added to party Michael Gilroy(pty:dft). (Ajlani Macri, Huda) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
4 4 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Michael Gilroy (Ajlani Macri, Huda) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
5 5 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Bond Hearing by Michael Gilroy. Responses due by 2/22/2024. (Ajlani Macri, Huda) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
6 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Continue Bond Hearing as to Michael Gilroy (1). Accordingly, the Bond Hearing scheduled on 2/9/2024 is CANCELLED and is RESCHEDULED to 2/13/2024 at 11:00am in the Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/8/2024. (tpl) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
Reset Hearing as to Michael Gilroy: Preliminary Examination RESET for 2/23/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (at) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Bond Hearing as to Michael Gilroy held on 2/13/2024. Stipulated Bond set: Michael Gilroy (1) $100,000 PSB. (Digital 11:09:09) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/13/2024. (tpl) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
8 8 Defense ORAL MOTION to Continue Arraignment by Michael Gilroy. (tpl) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting 8 Defense Oral Motion to Continue Arraignment as to Michael Gilroy (1). Arraignment set for 2/23/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 2/13/2024. See ECF entry 7 for full details. (tpl) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
10 10 $100,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Michael Gilroy Approved by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (tpl) (tpl). [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/13/2024) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
Thursday, February 15, 2024
11 11 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Change of Address and Permission to Travel by Michael Gilroy. Responses due by 2/29/2024. (Ajlani Macri, Huda) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE granting11 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Michael Gilroy (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 2/15/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at) [0:24-mj-06050-AOV]
Related: [-]
13 13 INDICTMENT and Forfeiture as to Michael Gilroy (1) count(s) 1-2. (tpl) (tpl).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/15/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment