California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher D Jaime
Case #: 2:24-bk-20606
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 11, 2024
Terminated:Apr 25, 2024

Debtor
Light Weavers Metaphysical Boutique, LLC
504 1st St
Wheatland, CA 95692-9454
Represented By
Peter G. Macaluso
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Nikki B. Farris
2607 Forest Ave #120
Chico, CA 95928
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814


Docket last updated: 02/17/2024 12:13 AM PST
Friday, February 16, 2024
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload Fri 02/16 4:24 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $0.00) (Peter G. Macaluso) (eFilingID: 7315499)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Master Address List Fri 02/16 4:28 PM
Master Address List (auto)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility First Meeting - 7 Business Fri 02/16 4:28 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 3/11/2024 at 12:00 PM. See our website for location. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form) Fri 02/16 4:34 PM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Nikki B. Farris (auto)
Related: [-]