Original Case: 3:23-cv-03184

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01235
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2024
Terminated:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 5:25 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
ERIN SHEEDY, Officer
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSHUA A. MEYER
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JORDAN J. GARRISON, Prosecutor
Represented By
Nadine J. Wichern
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SEAN YATES, Officer
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF ILLINOIS
Plaintiff - Appellant
TERREZ M. YOUNG
Represented By
Terrez M. Young
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 5:24 AM CDT
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Terrez M. Young by 02/21/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 02/28/2024. [1] [7364634] 24-1235 (MAN) [Entered: 02/15/2024 09:14 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 22 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellees State of Illinois and Sean Yates, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7364645] 24-1235 (MAN) [Entered: 02/15/2024 09:24 AM]
Related: [-]