Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Case #: 3:24-cv-01076
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:51 PM AST
Defendant
Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By
Antonio Gnocchi-Franco
Gnocchi-Franco Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Culebra Beach Villas Corporation
Represented By
Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez
Ortega& Ruiz, LLC
contact info
Mayra I. Ruiz-Muniz
Mayra I Ruiz-Muiz, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
Represented By
Ivan Aponte-Figueroa
Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
contact info
Defendant
Meraki Realty Group LLC
Represented By
Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
O'Neill & Borges, LLC
contact info
Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre
O'Neill & Borges, LLC
contact info
Defendant
A and B Insurance Company
Defendant
Autoridad de Conservacion y Desarrollo de Culebra
Defendant
X Company
Plaintiff
Patricia Kelly Hunt
Represented By
Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
contact info
Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Rivera Aspinall, Garriga & Fernandini
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Marie Hunt
Represented By
Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira
contact info
Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall
Rivera Aspinall, Garriga & Fernandini
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
42 42 order Order Mon 05/19 3:49 PM
ORDER re33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt,41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt. The motions at ECF No.33 ,41 are NOTED. The claims against Airbnb, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The claims against Autoridad de Conservacion y Desarrollo de Culebra and MAPFRE PRAICO Insurance Company are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A). Clerk of Court is to enter Partial Judgment accordingly. The case will continue as to Culebra Beach Villas Corp. and Meraki Realty Group LLC. The motions at ECF Nos.31 ,35 ,40 are MOOT. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/19/2025.(wm)
Related: [-]
41 41 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Attorney Only Mon 05/19 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Dismiss Mon 05/19 9:11 AM
MOTION to dismiss as to Mapfre Praico Insurance Company filed by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/2/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
39 39 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 05/14 11:41 AM
ORDER. The Motion for Leave to File Document at ECF No. 37 is GRANTED. The Court is aware that defendant undertook corrective action. Nonetheless, defendant is strongly cautioned that leave to file a motion in excess of page limits, Spanish-language documents while a translation is pending, or any other motion or document for which leave is required under the Local Rules, must be requested prior to the filing of the motion or document. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/14/2025. (wm)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/14 11:36 AM
ORDER. The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response at ECF No. 36 is GRANTED. Response to Motion Deadline due by 5/16/2025. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/14/2025. (wm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
37 37 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/12 12:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Zarel J. Soto-Acaba on behalf of Autoridad de Conservacion y Desarrollo de Culebra. Responses due by 5/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Soto-Acaba, Zarel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Translation
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/06 5:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 16, 2025 to File Response/Reply as to31 MOTION to dismiss of The Amended Complaint and/or Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law as to Mapfre Praico Insurance Company filed by Mapfre Praico Insurance Company filed by Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/20/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
Related: [-] 31
Monday, May 05, 2025
35 35 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 05/05 9:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs filed by Zarel J. Soto-Acaba on behalf of Autoridad de Conservacion y Desarrollo de Culebra. Responses due by 5/19/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Soto-Acaba, Zarel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit notice of lawsuit,
Att: 3 Exhibit certification,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deed
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
34 34 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/30 3:22 PM
Meraki Realty Group, LLC's ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint filed by Maria Cristina Torres-Short on behalf of Meraki Realty Group LLC.(Torres-Short, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Attorney Only Tue 04/29 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 04/24 4:23 PM
ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint filed by Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez on behalf of Culebra Beach Villas Corporation.(Ortega-Nunez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
31 31 motion Dismiss Tue 04/22 12:51 PM
MOTION to dismiss of The Amended Complaint and/or Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law as to Mapfre Praico Insurance Company filed by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/6/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit INSURANCE POLICY
Monday, April 21, 2025
30 30 20 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/21 11:24 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt.(Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
29 29 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/15 4:38 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff failed to comply with this Court's Order at ECF No. 28. Plaintiff is again ORDERED to file the tendered first amended complaint at ECF No. 20-1 as separate docket entry by no later than 04/24/2025. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. Compliance due by: 4/24/2025. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/15/2025.(wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 03/25 3:39 PM
ORDER.20 GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(2), plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file the tendered first amended complaint at ECF No. 20-1 as separate docket entry by not later than 04/03/2025. Consequently, the dispositive motions at ECF Nos. 14 and 26 are DENIED AS MOOT. See Connectu LLC v. Zuckerberg, 522 F.3d 82, 91 (1st Cir. 2008). Defendants may re-file in response to plaintiff's amended pleading. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/25/2025. (vso)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Cristina Torres-Short on behalf of Meraki Realty Group LLC (Torres-Short, Maria)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 07, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Sat 12/07 12:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Autoridad de Conservacion y Desarrollo de Culebra filed by Zarel J. Soto-Acaba on behalf of Autoridad de Conservacion y Desarrollo de Culebra. Responses due by 12/26/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Soto-Acaba, Zarel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 12/07 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zarel J. Soto-Acaba on behalf of Autoridad de Conservacion y Desarrollo de Culebra (Soto-Acaba, Zarel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Motion Mon 06/10 3:01 PM
REPLY to Motion PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN OPPOSITON TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Mapfre Praico Insurance Company Re:20 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt filed by Mapfre Praico Insurance Company. (Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 06/10 2:38 PM
ORDER re:22 Motion for Leave to File. GRANTED. Defendant shall file the reply tendered at ECF NO. 22-1 as a separate docket entry no later than five days after the issuance of this order. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/10/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Tue 06/04 3:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN OPPOSITON TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company Responses due by 6/18/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Reply to Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and/or Summary Judgment and Leave to File a First Amended Complaint
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Valldejuly-Sastre on behalf of Meraki Realty Group LLC (Valldejuly-Sastre, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 27, 2024
20 20 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/27 8:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss and/or Summary Judgment and Motion Requesting Permission to Amend Complaint filed by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt Re:14 MOTION to dismiss and/or Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law as to All Plaintiffs filed by Mapfre Praico Insurance Company filed by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt.(Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint
Friday, May 17, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/17 6:13 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for extension of time. Response to Motion Deadline due by 5/27/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 5/17/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Mon 05/13 7:04 PM
MOTION for extension of time until May 27, 2024 to To Oppose Motion of Dismissal and/or Summary Judgment filed by Julian R. Rivera-Aspinall on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/28/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance as additional counsel by Eduardo R. Jenks-Carballeira on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jenks-Carballeira, Eduardo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/03 4:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Meraki Realty Group LLC.(Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/03 3:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Mayra I. Ruiz-Muniz on behalf of Culebra Beach Villas Corporation.(Ruiz-Muniz, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Mon 04/29 11:47 AM
MOTION to dismiss and/or Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law as to All Plaintiffs filed by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company Responses due by 5/13/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit INSURANCE POLICY
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Attorney Only Mon 04/29 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice regarding codefendant Airbnb, Inc. by Kelly Marie Hunt, Patricia Kelly Hunt (Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/22 5:28 PM
ORDER. The Motion for extension of time at ECF No. 9 is GRANTED. Answer deadline due by 5/3/2024. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/22/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/22 5:16 PM
ORDER granting7 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 10, 2024 to File Answer re:1 Complaint. Answer deadline due by 5/10/2024. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/22/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/03 3:37 PM
ORDER re:6 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2024 to File Answer re:1 Complaint. GRANTED. Answer due by 4/26/2024. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/3/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
9 9 motion Appear Extension of Time Tue 04/02 2:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for extension of time until May 3, 2024 to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera on behalf of Meraki Realty Group LLC Responses due by 4/16/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Rivera, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Tue 04/02 1:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Mayra I. Ruiz-Muniz on behalf of Culebra Beach Villas Corporation Responses due by 4/16/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ruiz-Muniz, Mayra)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/02 1:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 10, 2024 to File Answer re:1 Complaint, filed by Patricia Kelly Hunt filed by Antonio Gnocchi-Franco on behalf of Airbnb, Inc. Responses due by 4/16/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Gnocchi-Franco, Antonio)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/27 4:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2024 to File Answer re:1 Complaint, filed by Patricia Kelly Hunt filed by Ivan Aponte-Figueroa on behalf of Mapfre Praico Insurance Company Responses due by 4/10/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Aponte-Figueroa, Ivan)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/19 4:16 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for extension of time. Answer deadline due by 5/3/2024. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/19/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/18 6:54 PM
MOTION for extension of time until May 3, 2024 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez on behalf of Culebra Beach Villas Corporation Responses due by 4/1/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortega-Nunez, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/21 5:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Airbnb, Inc., Autoridad de Conservacion, Culebra Beach Villas Corporation, Mapfre Praico Insurance Company, Meraki Realty Group LLC. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 02/21 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vrg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 17, 2024
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 02/17 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8558686.), filed by Patricia Kelly Hunt. Service due by 5/17/2024,(Rivera-Aspinall, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel,
Att: 2 Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons