Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:24-cv-00355
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2024
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Case in other court:Orane County Circuit Court, 2024-CA-000135-O
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 7:51 AM EDT
Defendant
OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc.
Represented By
Sarah P. L. Reiner
Grayrobinson, PA
contact info
Julie Zolty
Grayrobinson, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Ryan Scott Callen
Plaintiff
Adam Fountain
Represented By
Brandon J. Hill
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA
contact info
Luis A. Cabassa
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA
contact info
Amanda E. Heystek
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/05 4:04 PM
ORDER re 28 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/5/2024. (ABD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/29 1:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] iner, Sarah
Thursday, May 16, 2024
27 27 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 05/16 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 10:49 AM
ORDER re 24 Notice of Settlement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/15/2024. (ABD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
25 25 misc Response to order to show cause Tue 05/14 5:04 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re23 Order to show cause filed by Adam Fountain. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of settlement Tue 05/14 5:02 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Adam Fountain (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order to show cause Tue 05/14 2:16 PM
ORDER to show cause as to Adam Fountain. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order of April 24, 2024 directing counsel to "contact opposing counsel and the mediator to reserve a conference date and [to] file a Notice with the Court within 14 days of this Order advising of the date." (Doc. 22 , p.3) Such notice was never filed with the Court. Therefore, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/14/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 04/24 2:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2024. Discovery due by 2/3/2025. Dispositive motions due by 3/3/2025. Pretrial statement due by 6/16/2025. All other motions due by 6/23/2025. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/2/2024. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/6/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2025 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing on 8/4/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/18/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/24/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
21 21 misc Case Management Report Wed 04/17 10:23 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 04/05 2:56 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 24, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. before R. Scott Callen.(Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
19 19 order Order to Strike Wed 04/03 9:36 AM
ENDORSED ORDER to strike re: 18 Case Management Report. The parties are to refile the Case Management Report including the following dates: (1) disclosure of expert reports - class action, plaintiff and defendant; (2) discovery - class action; (3) motion for class certification; (4) response to motion for class certification; and (5) reply to motion for class certification, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/3/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
18 18 misc Case Management Report Tue 04/02 4:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
16 16 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 03/26 11:40 AM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: IDEAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 3/26/2024. (Digital / Zoom) (TNP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/28 1:42 PM
NOTICE of hearing re:7 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program. Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. A Zoom link will be sent to counsel via email. (TNP)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/28 9:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion for CMC re IDEAL Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/28/2024. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/26 6:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Case Management Conference Pursuant to Order of Referral to IDEAL Program by Adam Fountain. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/26 4:58 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint (Plaintff's) by OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] iner, Sarah
Thursday, February 22, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/22 8:09 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 5:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Interested Persons Order by Adam Fountain. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 02/21 5:24 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Adam Fountain. Related case(s): Yes (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 02/21 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda E. Heystek on behalf of Adam Fountain. Lead Counsel: Amanda E. Heystek. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Wed 02/21 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
6 6 order Interested Persons Order Tue 02/20 9:22 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/20/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/20 9:01 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-355-PGB-DCI. (RPB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 02/19 5:46 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc. d/b/a OnSite Business Services, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes Related [+]
Related: [-] iner, Sarah
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/19 5:44 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc. d/b/a OnSite Business Services, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] iner, Sarah
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 02/19 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sarah P. L. Reiner on behalf of OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc. d/b/a OnSite Business Services, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Sarah P.L. Reiner. Related [+]
Related: [-] iner, Sarah
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/19 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2024-CA-000135-O filed in State Court on 01/05/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21780052 filed by OnSite Employee Leasing, Inc. d/b/a OnSite Business Services, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] iner, Sarah
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Civil Cover Sheet