Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen K Caldwell
Referred: Matthew A Stinnett
Case #: 5:24-cv-00049
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2024
Case in other court:Fayette Circuit Court, 24-CI-00123
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 7:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Basin Equipment Leasing, LLC
Represented By
Michael P. Casey
Casey, Bailey & Maines, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Basin Transportation, LLC
Represented By
Michael P. Casey
Casey, Bailey & Maines, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Smith
Represented By
Michael P. Casey
Casey, Bailey & Maines, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Knowles
Represented By
Stuart Wade Hampton Yeoman
Caudill Finn & Yeoman
contact info
J. Tanner Watkins
Dinsmore & Shohl, Llp - Louisville
contact info
Corey Ann Finn
Finn & Yeoman
contact info
Stuart Wade Hampton Yeoman, I
Finn & Yeoman
contact info
Plaintiff
Landan Mitchell
Represented By
Stuart Wade Hampton Yeoman
Caudill Finn & Yeoman
contact info
J. Tanner Watkins
Dinsmore & Shohl, Llp - Louisville
contact info
Corey Ann Finn
Finn & Yeoman
contact info
Stuart Wade Hampton Yeoman, I
Finn & Yeoman
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Basin Environmental Compliance Services, LLC
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Defendant
Basin Environmental and Safety Technologies, LLC
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Defendant
Basin Oil and Gas, LLC
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Defendant
Basin Operating Services, LLC
Terminated: 02/20/2024


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Deadline Terminate Motions Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/07 8:43 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines15 : 1. Def shall supplement Discovery NLT 3/15/2025; 2. All fact discovery due NLT 9/1/2025; 3. Experts shall be disclosed by ptff NLT 10/1/2025 and by def NLT 11/1/2025; 4. Expert discovery shall be completed by 12/1/2025; 5. Dispositive/Daubert motions due NLT 1/15/2026; 6. TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE is CONTINUED to 6/4/2026 at 01:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell; 7. JURY TRIAL is CONTINUED to 6/29/2026 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. Parties to be present at 8:30 a.m. Est length is two weeks; 8. All other deadlines of the Court's Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/6/2025. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Wed 03/05 9:27 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Calwell for review: re15 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Basin Transportation, LLC (KCF) Modified text on 3/5/2025 (SLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time Tue 03/04 3:58 PM
JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Basin Transportation, LLC Motions referred to Matthew A. Stinnett.(Casey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
13 13 order Pretrial Order Wed 05/15 4:35 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER:1. NLT 21 days before PTC counsel shall file the following: (a) witness & exhibit lists; (b) motions in limine; (c) transcript of evidentiary depos; (d) pretrial memo; 2. NLT 14 days prior to final PTC, (a) file obj to list of witnesses/exhibits; (b) responses to any other party's motion in limine; and (c) responses to any other party's motion for ruling on any obj made in an evidentiary depo; 3. At final PTC, (a) counsel prepared to discuss stipulations; (b) disclose demonstrative or summary exhibits; (c) display all exhibits, premarked; (d) discuss the possibility of settlement; (e) advise of technological issues; 4. Final PTC attended by attorneys trying case. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/15/2024.(KCF)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Deadline Wed 05/15 4:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The following deadlines to be observed:(a) Counsel to exchange info required by Rule 26(a)(1) by 5/10/24;(b) Motion to join additional parties or to amend pleadings due 12/1/24;(c) Supplementation of disclosures & responses as required by Rule 26(e);(d) Expert trial witnesses due: Ptf-3/31/25; Dft-5/30/2025;(e) Fact discovery due 2/28/25; Expert discovery due 7/1/25;(f) Dispositive and Daubert motions due 8/1/25. No ext of time may be granted by USMJ;2. No motions to compel, nor motions relating to a discovery dispute shall be filed;3. Parties shall observe the following directives re the filing of discovery materials: (a) Rule 26(a)(I) Initial Disclosures, Interrogatories and Answers shall not be filed;(b) Portions of any discovery depos cited in any motion shall be filed of record in this case;4. No extensions of the deadlines set in this order, or PTC Order, shall be granted unless an appropriate motion is filed;5. TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/2/2026 at 03:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell;6. JURY TRIAL set for 3/2/2026 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. Counsel present at 8:30AM (2 weeks);This matter is referred to USMJ Stinnett for purposes of managing all discovery & pretrial scheduling issues. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/15/2024.(KCF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
11 11 discov Disclosures Fri 05/10 4:17 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Melissa Knowles, Landan Mitchell.(Finn, Corey)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Other Notice Fri 05/10 4:11 PM
NOTICE by Melissa Knowles, Landan Mitchell Regarding Service of Defendants(Finn, Corey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel
Thursday, May 09, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/09 2:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Basin Equipment Leasing, LLC.(Casey, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/09 12:49 PM
ORDER:Within 30 days from the entry of this order, the plaintiffs MUST FILE evidence that they have served the complaint on the dfts or evidence that the dfts have waived service. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/09/2024.(KCF)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/09 10:55 AM
NOTICE:All parties and counsel are hereby notified that the undersigned's stepson, Lloyd R. Cress, Jr., is employed as a non-equity member of Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 05/09/2024.(KCF)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Fri 05/10 8:42 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen Caldwell for review:9 Answer to Complaint (KCF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 discov Disclosures Wed 05/08 3:11 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Basin Transportation, LLC.(Casey, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 05/08 9:38 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Casey, Michael) Modified filers on 5/8/2024 (KCF)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Wed 05/08 3:27 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen Caldwell for review:5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KCF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Thu 04/18 2:18 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Melissa Knowles, Landan Mitchell. (Finn, Corey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Tue 02/20 10:10 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Basin Equipment Leasing, LLC, Basin Transportation, LLC, Michael Smith identifying Other Affiliate Randall D. Holleyman, Other Affiliate John R. Snedegar for Basin Equipment Leasing, LLC, Basin Transportation, LLC.(KCF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Basin Transportation, LLC,
Att: 2 Michael Smith
misc Conflict Check Tue 02/20 10:05 AM
Conflict Check run. (KCF)
Related: [-]
notice Notice for Attorney to Update Address Tue 02/20 10:12 AM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to S. Wade Yeoman: Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (KCF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 02/20 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00123. (Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5772700), filed by Basin Equipment Leasing, LLC, Basin Transportation, LLC, Michael Smith.(KCF) Modified on 2/20/2024 (STC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel,
Att: 4 Exhibit Agreed Order of Dismissal,
Att: 5 Exhibit Emails,
Att: 6 Exhibit Certificate of Filing,
Att: 7 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 8 Exhibit Notice of Removal-State,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Addendum Civil Cover Sheet