Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Referred: Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:14-cv-00748
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2014
Terminated:Feb 11, 2015
Last checked: Monday May 18, 2015 6:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Alice Briggs
Defendant
Sean P. Briggs
Defendant
Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By
Brent Jason Rodine
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser, Pc - Dallas
contact info
William Lance Lewis
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser, Pc - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Sagi Nidam

GPO Feb 10 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/10/15. (cm, )

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
12 12 order Judgment Wed 02/11 1:31 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs claims are dismissed without prejudice against Defendants Sean P. Briggs and Alice Briggs. IT IS ORDERED that each of the parties shall bear their own costs incurred in this suit. IT IS ORDERED that this is a final judgment disposing of all claims among all parties and any relief not expressly granted is denied. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/11/15. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
11 11 4 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/10 8:30 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/10/15. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 12, 2015
10 10 misc Mail Returned Mon 01/12 3:49 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re:6 Mail sent to Jared Kawalsky. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 05, 2015
9 9 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 01/08 11:34 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III for all further proceedings. Judge Ron Clark no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 1/5/15. (cm, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/08 11:35 AM
Magistrate Judge Amos L. (Mag) Mazzant no longer assigned to case. (cm, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/08 11:36 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 26, 2014
8 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation.(Rodine, Brent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 25, 2014
7 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Notice of Removal,..(Rodine, Brent) Modified on 11/26/2014 (cm, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit D-State Court Docket Sheet
Thursday, November 20, 2014
6 6 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Plaintiffs amended complaint is due thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Defendants amended answer is due twenty (20) days from receipt of the amended complaint. Any prior deadline for Defendants answer shall be extended to the date set by this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 11/20/14. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Order #6 sent via First Class and Certified Mail to Plaintiff's counsel, Jared Kawalsky. RRR 7013 3020 0001 2030 9593. (cm, ) Modified on 11/26/2014 (cm, ).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 19, 2014
5 5 ***PREVIOUSLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alice Briggs, Sean P. Briggs, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, filed by Sagi Nidam.(cm, )
Related: [-]
4 4 ***PREVIOUSLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Alice Briggs, Sean P. Briggs, Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, filed by Sagi Nidam.(cm, )
Related: [-]
3 3 Case Assigned to Judge Ron Clark and Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant Pursuant to a Standing Order. (cm, )
Related: [-]
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation. (Rodine, Brent)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation from 296th District Court, Collin County, TX, case number 296-04368-2014. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4934302), filed by Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation.(Lewis, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (cm, )
Related: [-]
Notified Attorney for Plaintiff, Jared Kawalsky, Per GO 04-12 this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (cm, )
Related: [-]