Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:24-cv-00172
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Violation of the Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Aug 18, 2024 4:51 AM EDT
defendant
Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C.
Represented By
Breanne Gilliam
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Rebecca L. Strauss
Miller Johnson Plc (kalamazoo)
contact info
plaintiff
Stacy McCarron
Represented By
David A. Nacht
Nachtlaw, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Monday, January 27, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 01/27 12:14 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL; approving STIPULATION15 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
15 15 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 01/24 2:43 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice by defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. (Gilliam, Breanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Mon 01/06 4:47 PM
ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents to be submitted by 2/3/2025; the 1/21/2025 settlement conference is adjourned without date at this time; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
13 13 service Proof of Service Wed 11/20 11:36 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. for Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Strauss, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
12 12 service Proof of Service Tue 11/05 1:17 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. for Notice of Taking Deposition of Plaintiff (Strauss, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 order Case Management Order Tue 06/11 2:04 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 12/13/2024; dispositive motions due by 2/28/2025; settlement conference set for 1/21/2025 at 09:30 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 7/14/2025 at 09:30 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 8/5/2025 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 By Telephone Mon 06/10 10:09 AM
MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 06/05 1:13 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Stacy McCarron (Nacht, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Fri 05/10 8:55 AM
ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/10/2024 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 6/5/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/24 3:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. (Strauss, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone Fri 04/19 5:03 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 5/29/2024 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 5/23/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/18 5:50 PM
ORDER that defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 04/16 10:15 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Breanne Gilliam on behalf of defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. (Gilliam, Breanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/15 2:14 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. (Strauss, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/15 2:09 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Rebecca L. Strauss on behalf of defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. (Strauss, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/21 10:36 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. (ems)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 02/21 10:17 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Wed 02/21 10:18 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. (filing fee not paid) (ems)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Wed 02/21 10:21 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Stacy McCarron in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7298225 (Nacht, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/20 4:48 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cancer & Hematology Centers of Western Michigan, P.C. filed by Stacy McCarron (Nacht, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to be issued