Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:David W Dugan
Case #: 3:24-cv-00467
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025
Petitioner
Edward S. Phillips
Respondent
Anthony Wills

GPO Apr 15 2024
ORDER FOR THE SERVICE OF PROCESS upon Respondent. The Court FINDS the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1) survives a preliminary review. Respondent is DIRECTED to file a Response by May 15, 2024. Petitioner shall then have until June 14, 2024, to file a Reply. Consistent with footnote 1, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to correct the docket to reflect that Respondent is Warden Anthony Wills. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/15/2024. (jnh)
GPO Feb 07 2025
ORDER. For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10) Petitioner's Habeas Petition (Doc. 1) is GRANTED and a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. The case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/7/2025. (jnh)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 03/11 10:51 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1393 for16 Notice of Appeal filed by Edward S. Phillips.(clw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docketing Statement
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 appeal Transcript Info Sheet by Attorney/Pro Se Party Mon 03/10 11:27 AM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION SHEET by Attorney/Pro Se Party (Whitney, Richard)
Related: [-]
18 18 appeal Rule 10 Letter Mon 03/10 10:55 AM
Rule 10 Letter. (adh)
Related: [-]
17 17 appeal Transmission of Short Record to USCA Mon 03/10 10:47 AM
Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re16 Notice of Appeal. (adh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
16 16 appeal Notice of Appeal Sun 03/09 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to14 Order,, Terminate Motions,15 Judgment by Edward S. Phillips. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AILSDC-5604075. (Whitney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
15 15 order Judgment Fri 02/07 11:23 AM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Approved by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/7/2025. (dmw2)
Related: [-]
14 14 41 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/07 8:54 AM
ORDER. For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, Respondent's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10) Petitioner's Habeas Petition (Doc. 1) is GRANTED and a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED . The case is DISMISSED with prejudice . The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 2/7/2025. (jnh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/20 6:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward S. Phillips.(Whitney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Richard J. Whitney,
Att: 2 Affidavit Ex.B -- Affidavit of Edward S. Phillips,
Att: 3 Exhibit C -- Affidavit of Petitioner from post-conviction petition
Monday, August 19, 2024
12 12 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/19 9:06 AM
ORDER regarding Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss the Habeas Petition. (Doc. 11). For good cause shown therein by Petitioner's attorney, and without objection from Respondent, the Unopposed Motion is GRANTED . Petitioner's Response is due on or before September 20, 2024. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 8/19/2024. (jnh)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/19 10:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 9/20/2024 (adh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/15 5:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss by Edward S. Phillips. (Whitney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 07/22 2:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Anthony Wills.(Moeller, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D (1of2),
Att: 5 Exhibit D (2of2),
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H
Friday, June 14, 2024
9 9 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/14 9:29 AM
ORDER regarding Respondent's Unopposed Second Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (Doc. 8). For good cause shown therein, and without objection from Plaintiff, who is represented by counsel, that Motion is GRANTED . Respondent shall file a Responsive Pleading by July 24, 2024. Plaintiff shall then have until August 23, 2024, to file a Reply. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 6/14/2024. (jnh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time Thu 06/13 2:12 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed by Anthony Wills. (Moeller, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
7 7 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/08 8:55 AM
ORDER regarding the Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (Doc. 6). For good cause shown therein, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Respondent shall file a responsive pleading on or before June 19, 2024. Petitioner shall then have until July 19, 2024, to file a Reply. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 5/8/2024. (jnh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/07 2:45 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time by Anthony Wills. (Moeller, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/07 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Moeller on behalf of Anthony Wills (Moeller, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Mon 04/15 11:15 AM
Letter to Illinois Attorney General constituting service. (tjk)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Order for Service of Process - Prisoner ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/15 8:48 AM
ORDER FOR THE SERVICE OF PROCESS upon Respondent. The Court FINDS the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1) survives a preliminary review. Respondent is DIRECTED to file a Response by May 15, 2024. Petitioner shall then have until June 14, 2024, to file a Reply. Consistent with footnote 1, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to correct the docket to reflect that Respondent is Warden Anthony Wills. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/15/2024. (jnh)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/15 10:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 5/15/2024. (adh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
2 2 utility Case Opening Notification Wed 02/21 10:17 AM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge David W. Dugan assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-467-DWD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jaj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 02/20 3:33 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AILSDC-5316749.), filed by Edward S. Phillips.(Whitney, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet