Washington Western District Court
Judge:Robert S Lasnik
Case #: 2:24-cv-00229
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 18, 2024 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
STR LLC
Represented By
Elyse M Greenwald
contact info
Sarah M Ray
Latham & Watkins (sf)
contact info
Lawrence E Buterman
Latham & Watkins Llp (ny)
contact info
Vanessa Soriano Power
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
David L Johnson
Latham & Watkins (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Hyatt Corporation
Represented By
Douglas Litvack
Jenner & Block (dc)
contact info
Michael Rosenberger
Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP
contact info
Lindsay C. Harrison
Jenner & Block (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc
Represented By
Neal Potischman
Davis Polk & Wardwell (ca)
contact info
D Jarrett Arp
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (dc)
contact info
Mari Grace
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (dc)
contact info
Tina Joe
Davis Polk & Wardwell (ny)
contact info
Heidi B Bradley
Bradley Bernstein Sands LLP
contact info
Defendant
Loews Hotels Holding Corporation
Represented By
Paul D Brachman
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc)
contact info
Katherine Forrest
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison (ny)
contact info
Robert J Maguire
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Matthew Robinson
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison (ny)
contact info
Emily Parsons
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Six Continents Hotels Inc
Represented By
Emily S Newton
King & Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Paul R Taylor
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Caroline Buyak
King & Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Lohr A Beck
King & Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Jeffrey S Cashdan
King & Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Defendant
Marriott International Inc
Represented By
Sarah Akhtar
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (dc)
contact info
Melanie L. Katsur
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (dc)
contact info
Kristen C Limarzi
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (dc)
contact info
Jeffrey B Coopersmith
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Steven W Fogg
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Accor Management US Inc
Represented By
Robin Wechkin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Carrie Mahan
Sidley Austin (dc)
contact info
Benjamin M Mundel
Sidley Austin (dc)
contact info
Chad Samuel Hummel
Mckool Smith Pc (ca)
contact info
Sandra Nicole Booth
Sidley Austin (dc)
contact info
Chad S Hummel
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Amy P Lally
contact info
Defendant
CoStar Group Inc
Represented By
Elyse M Greenwald
contact info
Sarah M Ray
Latham & Watkins (sf)
contact info
Lawrence E Buterman
Latham & Watkins Llp (ny)
contact info
Vanessa Soriano Power
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
David L Johnson
Latham & Watkins (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Freddy Barajas
Represented By
Theodore J Wojcik
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Rio S Pierce
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Xiaoyi Fan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Heriberto Valiente
Represented By
Theodore J Wojcik
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Rio S Pierce
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Xiaoyi Fan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Smith
Represented By
Theodore J Wojcik
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Rio S Pierce
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Xiaoyi Fan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeanette Portillo
Represented By
Theodore J Wojcik
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Rio S Pierce
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Xiaoyi Fan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Kassl
Represented By
Theodore J Wojcik
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Rio S Pierce
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Xiaoyi Fan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
David Concepcion
Represented By
Theodore J Wojcik
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Rio S Pierce
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Xiaoyi Fan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Alicia Coakley
Represented By
Theodore J Wojcik
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Rio S Pierce
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Xiaoyi Fan
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hyatt Hotels Corporation
Terminated: 05/21/2024
Represented By
Douglas Litvack
Jenner & Block (dc)
contact info
Michael Rosenberger
Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP
contact info
Lindsay C. Harrison
Jenner & Block (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Terminated: 03/21/2024
Represented By
Paul R Taylor
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
STR Inc
Terminated: 06/04/2024
Represented By
Elyse M Greenwald
contact info
Sarah M Ray
Latham & Watkins (sf)
contact info
Lawrence E Buterman
Latham & Watkins Llp (ny)
contact info
Vanessa Soriano Power
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
David L Johnson
Latham & Watkins (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc
Terminated: 04/16/2024
Represented By
Neal Potischman
Davis Polk & Wardwell (ca)
contact info
D Jarrett Arp
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (dc)
contact info
Mari Grace
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (dc)
contact info
Tina Joe
Davis Polk & Wardwell (ny)
contact info
Heidi B Bradley
Bradley Bernstein Sands LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
114 114 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 04/01 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re91 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants CoStar Group Inc, STR LLC (Buterman, Lawrence)
Related: [-]