Allen v. CT Corporation System et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00372 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 11:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
CT Corporation System
|
|
Plaintiff
Doris Annette Allen
629 Mulbetty
Desoto, TX 75115 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER : Treating pro se plaintiff's 3/7/20246 motion to withdraw as a notice of dismissal, this action is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's 3/7/20247 application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs is denied without prejudice as moot. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/14/2024) (sxf) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 03/14 11:10 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Mar 14 11:10:38 CDT 2024 (crt) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Doris Annette Allen. (kaf) |
|
6 | 6
![]() MOTION to Withdraw case filed by Doris Annette Allen. (kaf) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/06 1:15 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Mar 6 13:15:45 CST 2024 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER: No later than 3/12/2024, plaintiff must file an amended complaint that complies with Rule 8(a). Plaintiffs failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this case for want of prosecution under Rule 41(b). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/27/2024) (agc) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 02/20 9:02 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue Feb 20 09:02:17 CST 2024 (crt) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Doris Annette Allen. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (kcr) |
|
3 | 3
![]() COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, CT Corporation System filed by Doris Annette Allen. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number 300010339) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr) |
|
1 | 1
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr) |