California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:24-cv-01031
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 18, 2024 1:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Linxx Global Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Marlene S. Muraco
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Linxx Security Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Marlene S. Muraco
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
David Oliquino
Represented By
Norman B. Blumenthal
Blumenthal, Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. De Blouw
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Kyle R. Nordrehaug
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Aparajit Bhowmik
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Charlotte Elise James
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Piya Mukherjee
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info

GPO May 16 2024
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 24-cv-01031 and 24-cv-1032. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 5/16/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2024)

Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 04/01 10:36 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The parties are hereby notified that the Status Conference is rescheduled to 5/16/2025 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. An updated joint status report must be filed by 5/9/2025. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
28 28 misc Joint Case Management Statement Mon 03/31 4:38 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by David Oliquino. (Mukherjee, Piya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
27 27 order Order Wed 02/12 6:23 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: In light of the parties' settlement (see case no. 24-cv-01032-AGT, Dkt. 27 ), all currently set dates in the case are vacated. The Court sets a status conference for April 4, 2025. A joint status report is due the week before, on March 28, 2025. If dismissal paperwork is filed before then, the Court will vacate the status conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (agtlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 01/08 9:41 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties are hereby notified that the Further Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 2/14/2025 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 01/07 9:23 AM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference, which is set for 1/10/2025 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
24 24 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 01/06 9:18 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (with Request to Continue Conference) filed by Linxx Security Solutions, Inc., Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. (Muraco, Marlene) Modified on 1/6/2025 (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 01/06 12:08 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] Re:23 Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Linxx Security Solutions, Inc., Linxx Global Solutions, Inc.,24 Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Linxx Security Solutions, Inc., Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. Reminder: Joint Case Management Statements must be e-filed under the following event: Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents --> Joint Case Management Statement Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
23 23 misc Status Report Fri 01/03 5:02 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Linxx Security Solutions, Inc., Linxx Global Solutions, Inc.. (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
22 22 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/28 9:02 AM
Minute Entry for case management conference held on 5/24/2024 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Parties are scheduled to engage in private mediation in December 2024. A further case management conference is set for 1/10/2025 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, - Videoconference Only. Zoom Recording Time: 2:05 - 2:09. Plaintiff Attorney: Charlotte James. Defendant Attorney: Elisa Nadeau. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2024)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Wed 05/29 5:02 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Tue 05/21 9:16 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Alex G. Tse on 5/21/2024. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
20 20 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 05/17 3:55 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Mukherjee, Piya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
19 19 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Thu 05/16 4:44 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 24-cv-01031 and 24-cv-1032. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 5/16/2024. (sklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 05/14 12:11 PM
CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference, which is set for 5/24/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, will be held via a Zoom webinar.. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
17 17 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 04/29 4:23 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mukherjee, Piya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
16 16 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/20 4:40 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc., Linxx Security Solutions, Inc... (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 03/06 1:52 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination. Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/20/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/05 9:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Oliquino.. (Mukherjee, Piya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Elise James (James, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Bree Rivapalacio (Rivapalacio, Victoria)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/28 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Piya Mukherjee (Mukherjee, Piya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 02/21 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc., Linxx Security Solutions, Inc. re 6 Case Assigned by Intake,,8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/21 12:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc., Linxx Security Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LGS Management Group, Inc. for Linxx Global Solutions, Inc., Linxx Security Solutions, Inc.. re3 Notice (Other) Defendants' Notice of Interested Parties (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 02/21 12:07 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Additional Parties Wed 02/21 11:59 AM
Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on1 Notice of Removal,, and have been added to this case: Linxx Security Solutions, Inc.. (This is a text-only entry.) (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 02/21 8:57 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 02/20 10:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. & Linxx Security Solutions, Inc. re3 Notice (Other),2 Civil Cover Sheet,1 Notice of Removal,,4 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 02/20 10:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. & Linxx Security Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LGS Management Group, Inc. for Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. & Linxx Security Solutions, Inc.. re1 Notice of Removal,, (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/20 10:16 PM
NOTICE by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. & Linxx Security Solutions, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,, Defendants' Notice of Interested Parties (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/20 10:08 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. & Linxx Security Solutions, Inc. . (Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 02/20 10:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1331, 1441(a), AND 1442 (a)(1) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV038691. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19142520). Filed by Linxx Global Solutions, Inc. & Linxx Security Solutions, Inc..(Muraco, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice,
Att: 4 Declaration of MSM ISO Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1441(a) and 1442(a)(1),
Att: 5 Exhibit A to Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit B to Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit C to Declaration