New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:24-cv-00971
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
JACK ABUHOFF
Represented By
HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
MARISSA ESPINELI
Represented By
HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
INNODATA INC.
Represented By
HARVEY BARTLE, IV
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
MARK SPELKER
Lead Plaintiff
Randall Jones
Represented By
LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Movant
CURTIS GARDNER
Represented By
THOMAS HENRY PRZYBYLOWSKI
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Movant
FRANCIS GRONDIN
Represented By
KEVIN G. COOPER
Carella Byrne Cecchi Brody & Agnello
contact info
Movant
JEFFREY MORROW
Represented By
LAURENCE M. ROSEN
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Notice Only
PHV CHRISTOPHER M. WASIL
Notice Only
PHV MICHAEL D. BLANCHARD
Notice Only
PHV JACOB A. WALKER
Notice Only
PHV LESLEY F. PORTNOY
Notice Only
PHV JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN
Notice Only
PHV J. ALEXANDER HOOD II
Notice Only
PHV JEFFREY C. BLOCK
Plaintiff
DAVID D'AGOSTINO
Represented By
DONALD A. ECKLUND
Carella, Byrne, Cecchi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 30 2024
OPINION. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 10/30/2024. (sm)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
52 52 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 3:14 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAVID D'AGOSTINO, FRANCIS GRONDIN re50 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (CECCHI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
51 51 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 3:13 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by DAVID D'AGOSTINO, FRANCIS GRONDIN re49 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (DKT No. 48) (CECCHI, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
50 50 motion Dismiss Mon 04/14 12:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint by MARK SPELKER.(DOLUISIO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Order of Dismissal of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 9:23 AM
Set Deadlines as to49 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 5/5/2025 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 3:22 PM
Set Deadlines as to50 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint . Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]