Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Referred: Maritza Dominguez Braswel
Case #: 1:24-cv-00492
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 2:17 AM MDT
Defendant
Grubhub Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Michael Alan Watts
Retherford, Mullen & Moore, LLC
contact info
Michael Jason Decker
Murphy & Decker, PC
contact info
Eric Michael Lee
Murphy & Decker, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Parker
Represented By
Patrick D. Mika
Mika & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
51 51 order Order on Motion for Leave Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Fri 05/16 3:30 PM
ORDER: re:49 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify. Plaintiff moves to amend the complaint. By way of discussing conferral, the motion states: Plaintiff notified Defendant Grubhub via electronic mail of his intent to file this motion, included a copy of the motion and proposed amendment, asked Defendant Grubhub its position, and offered to discuss the matter further. As of May 13, 2025, Defendant Grubhub has not responded. This causes the Court significant concern. The conferral obligation is NOT to be ignored. The Court further notes that Judge Braswell has previously counseled the parties on this topic. All parties are obligated to confer rather than fail to respond or reflexively say no. The motion at D. 49 is stricken. The Parties SHALL meaningfully confer before refiling of the motion. The Court hopes this strongly worded order sends the appropriate message and the Court does not have to go the route of a Show Cause Order or contempt proceedings. The Court will not set a Final Pretrial Conference until this matter has been sorted out. So Ordered by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 5/16/2025. Text Only Entry(sphil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
50 50 order Memorandum Tue 05/13 10:50 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding49 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify3 Complaint filed by Kelly Parker. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell by District Judge Gordon P Gallagher on 05/13/2025. Text Only Entry (dclem)
Related: [-]
49 49 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Tue 05/13 10:44 AM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify3 Complaint by Plaintiff Kelly Parker.(Mika, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - red line version,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - fresh as amended