New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Ann M Donnelly
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:24-cv-01303
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Katherine Espinal-Peralta
212 East Avenue
Riverhead, NY 11901
Plaintiff
Luxury Lease Partners, LLC
as servicer for Luxury Lease Company, LLC, a Delaware Statutory Trust 210 Summit Avenue Suite C4
Montvale, NJ 07645
Represented By
Nicholas Gaunce
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, June 24, 2024
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 06/24 3:27 PM
Civil Case Terminated as per voluntary dismissal. (RG)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 06/21 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luxury Lease Partners, LLC Without Prejudice (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Show Cause Thu 02/29 6:13 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/28/2024. (DG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
10 10 motion Show Cause Tue 02/27 1:54 PM
Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause Proposed Order for 2.28.24 Hearing by Luxury Lease Partners, LLC. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/27 1:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luxury Lease Partners, LLC. Katherine Espinal-Peralta served on 2/23/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 02/22 11:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Katherine Espinal-Peralta. (EF)
Related: [-]
7 7 13 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 02/22 11:18 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS AMENDED. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/28/2024 AT 1:00 P.M., in Courtroom 4G North. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/22/2024. (DG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/21 2:56 PM
Proposed Summons. by Luxury Lease Partners, LLC (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 02/21 2:48 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 02/21 2:37 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 2:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luxury Lease Partners, LLC, as servicer for Luxury Lease Company, LLC, a Delaware Statutory Trust (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Show Cause Wed 02/21 2:19 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Luxury Lease Partners, LLC, as servicer for Luxury Lease Company, LLC, a Delaware Statutory Trust. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Order to Show Cause,
Att: 2 Declaration of Emergency,
Att: 3 Declaration of Jim Moscatello
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/21 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Katherine Espinal-Peralta filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17589809 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Luxury Lease Partners, LLC, as servicer for Luxury Lease Company, LLC, a Delaware Statutory Trust. (Gaunce, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Title,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Lease Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - ACH Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - E-mails,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - GPS Data,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Amount Due Calculation,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Declaration Jim Moscatello
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 02/21 2:41 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]