Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Birch
Case #: 0:24-cv-60292
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:0621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Hernandez Construction, LLC
Represented By
Diana E. Rafael
Cole, Scott And Kissane
contact info
Mediator
Pamela I. Perry
Plaintiff
John Criscione
Represented By
G Ware Cornell, Jr.
Cornell & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, January 27, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 01/27 4:13 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) . All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
39 39 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 01/27 3:29 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re37 Stipulation. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#38]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/27 3:29 PM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Case with Prejudice by John Criscione, Hernandez Construction, LLC (ls)(See Image at DE #37)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Stipulation Mon 01/27 3:17 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Hernandez Construction, LLC (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
36 36 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 12/26 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT- The parties shall file their Stipulation of Dismissal in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 on or before January 27, 2025. All pending motions not otherwise ruled upon are DENIED AS MOOT. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (mab)
Related: [-]
35 35 adr Mediation Report Tue 12/24 2:46 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Pamela Perry. Prepared by: Pamela Perry. Filed by Pamela I. Perry. Disposition: Settled in full. (Perry, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/12 2:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting33 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's Motion for for Summary Judgment by December 31, 2024 . Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/12/2024. (cbn)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/12 12:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To respond to motion for summary judgment re26 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by John Criscione. Responses due by 12/26/2024. (Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/09 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Mediation by Hernandez Construction, LLC (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 12/09 2:53 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/11/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
30 30 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 12/06 11:13 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hernandez Construction, LLC.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate Tue 12/03 3:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO MEDIATE re22 Motion for Extension of Time to Mediate. Mediation Deadline 12/18/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 12/03 9:32 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying25 Revised Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. The parties have failed to show "good cause," as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(4). This case was filed in February 2024. It appears from the motion that the parties did not begin taking depositions until November 2024. The parties have not explained the reason for this delay. Thus, the parties have failed to establish that they have been diligent. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/3/2024. (cbn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 12/03 10:23 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/6/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Judgment as a Matter of Law Mon 12/02 11:58 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Hernandez Construction, LLC.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Material Facts,
Att: 2 Deposition Plaintiff's Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit to Deposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit to Deposition,
Att: 5 Affidavit of Tom Burkett,
Att: 6 Deposition of Jeff Morrow,
Att: 7 Affidavit of Don Woods
25 25 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/02 6:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Hernandez Construction, LLC. Responses due by 12/16/2024.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Revised Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/02 5:09 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. The parties have failed to show "good cause," as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b)(4). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/2/2024. (cbn)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/02 4:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Hernandez Construction, LLC. Responses due by 12/16/2024.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Mediate Mon 12/02 4:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by Hernandez Construction, LLC.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Motion for Two-Day Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/22 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Deposition of John Criscione by Hernandez Construction, LLC (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 10/18 5:03 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of RANDALL CUMMINGS by John Criscione.(Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
19 19 discov Notice to Take Deposition Fri 10/18 5:01 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeff Morrow by John Criscione.(Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
18 18 trial Witness List Thu 10/17 8:58 PM
Witness List by Hernandez Construction, LLC.. (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
17 17 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Thu 06/20 3:19 PM
Corrected NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 11/19/2024 at 10 a.m.. (Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 06/18 8:55 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
15 15 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 06/14 5:16 AM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Pam Perry as Mediator. (Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
14 14 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/17 3:30 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 5/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 05/17 3:01 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Mediation Deadline 12/16/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/17 3:00 PM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith, Calendar Call set for 4/29/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith, Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2024, Expert Discovery due by 11/18/2024, Fact Discovery due by 11/18/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2024, Mediation Deadline 12/16/2024, In Limine Motions due by 4/4/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2024, Motions due by 4/4/2025, Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/4/2025), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/15 5:54 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Hernandez Construction, LLC (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 04/15 5:45 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Hernandez Construction, LLC(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Certification Election to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate for Final Disposition of Motions,
Att: 3 Certification Election to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate for Trial
9 9 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 04/15 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Compliance Certicate of Interested Persons by John Criscione re7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/29 3:24 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hernandez Construction, LLC. (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
7 7 8 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 03/18 12:53 PM
ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/15/2024 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/18 11:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its response by March 29, 2024 . In the future, any motions for extension of time filed on the day of the deadline shall be denied absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/18/2024. (cbn)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Mon 03/18 11:52 AM
Set Response/Answer Due Deadline: Hernandez Construction, LLC response/answer due 3/29/2024. PER DE#6 (cds)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/15 7:16 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hernandez Construction, LLC. Responses due by 3/29/2024.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/15 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diana E. Rafael on behalf of Hernandez Construction, LLC. Attorney Diana E. Rafael added to party Hernandez Construction, LLC(pty:dft). (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/21 3:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Hernandez Construction, LLC. (wce)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 02/21 3:54 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/21 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Hernandez Construction LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17308947, filed by John Criscione.(Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet