Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen H Locher
Referred: Helen C Adams
Case #: 4:24-cv-00071
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 3:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Double Down Rebar, LLC
Plaintiff
Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By
Michael Elias Amash
Blake & Uhlig P. A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund
Represented By
Michael Elias Amash
Blake & Uhlig P. A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Laborers' National Pension Fund
Represented By
Michael Elias Amash
Blake & Uhlig P. A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 08, 2024
6 6 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 04/08 10:15 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Double Down Rebar, LLC. (nla)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
5 5 motion Default Entry by Clerk Fri 04/05 1:13 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default re Double Down Rebar, LLC by Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund, Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Laborers' National Pension Fund. Responses due by 4/19/2024. (Amash, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF Fri 04/05 1:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund, Laborers' National Pension Fund. (Amash, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/29 10:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Iowa Laborers' Education and Training Fund, Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Laborers' National Pension Fund. Double Down Rebar, LLC served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Amash, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
2 2 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Thu 02/22 9:45 AM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (nla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7.1 Packet
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/21 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5380835., filed by Iowa Laborers Training and Education Fund, by and through its Trustees, Iowa Laborers' District Council Health and Welfare Trust Fund, by and through its Trustees, Laborers' National Pension Fund, by and through its Trustees. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/21/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/21/2024.(Amash, Michael)
Related: [-]