Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Paul C Huck
Case #: 1:24-cv-20674
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:0499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
FP & H LLC
Represented By
Evan Bart Plotka
Evan B. Plotka Pl
contact info
Defendant
Jesus Menendez
Represented By
Evan Bart Plotka
Evan B. Plotka Pl
contact info
Plaintiff
Alk Trading Corp.
Represented By
Allison Levey Friedman
Allison L. Friedman, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
From the South Investment, LLC
Represented By
Allison Levey Friedman
Allison L. Friedman, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 07/17 12:33 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. CLOSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 7/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Wed 03/27 10:30 AM
NOTICE SETTING THIRD TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 4/1/2024 at 10:15 AM before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Status Conference Tue 03/26 10:45 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Status Conference held on 3/26/2024. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 6 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Allison Levey Friedman, Evan Bart Plotka, Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 772-467-2337 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jg02)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 14 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 03/25 3:54 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Reply in Opposition by FP & H LLC, Jesus Menendez.(Plotka, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit Jesus Menendez
Friday, March 22, 2024
11 11 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/22 2:21 PM
NOTICE Of Acceptance of Service of Process by Jesus Menendez. Attorney Evan Bart Plotka added to party Jesus Menendez(pty:dft). (Plotka, Evan)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/22 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan Bart Plotka on behalf of FP & H LLC (Plotka, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Wed 03/20 3:48 PM
NOTICE Setting Second Telephonic Status Conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/26/2024 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Status Conference Wed 03/20 10:26 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Status Conference held on 3/20/2024. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 6 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Evan Bart Plotka, Allison Levey Friedman, Attorney added: Evan Bart Plotka for FP & H LLC (jg02)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order Fri 03/15 5:19 PM
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.65 Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Fri 03/15 5:17 PM
NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/20/2024 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 3/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
4 4 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Thu 02/22 10:27 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet form was attached, but it was not completed. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (caw)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/22 10:26 AM
Summons Issued as to FP & H LLC d/b/a FLEISCHMANNS PRODUCE, and JESUS MENENDEZ. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 02/22 10:21 AM
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/21 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17309606, filed by FROM THE SOUTH INVESTMENT, LLC, ALK TRADING CORP..(Friedman, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 2 pgs Summon(s),
Att: 5 2 pgs Summon(s)