California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-01426
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24STCV01180
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 1:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Yum Connect, LLC
Represented By
Malak Cherkaoui Jaouad
Constangy, Brooks, Smoth, And Prophete, LLP
contact info
Terry L. Higham
Constangy Brooks Smith And Prophete LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Adrienne Mejia
Represented By
Malak Cherkaoui Jaouad
Constangy, Brooks, Smoth, And Prophete, LLP
contact info
Terry L. Higham
Constangy Brooks Smith And Prophete LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pizza Hut of America, LLC
Represented By
Malak Cherkaoui Jaouad
Constangy, Brooks, Smoth, And Prophete, LLP
contact info
Terry L. Higham
Constangy Brooks Smith And Prophete LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Chris Downs
Represented By
Shawn Zaman
Zaman Triral Lawyers PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
23 23 1 pgs misc Receipt Thu 06/27 9:24 AM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
22 22 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Mon 06/17 3:55 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Compel Arbitration Remand Case to State Court Mon 06/17 3:54 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's Motion for Remand10 is granted as set forth in this Order. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
20 20 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 04/15 4:01 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District10 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice by Defendants in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, Pizza Hut of America, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC.(Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit A - Pizza Hut of America, LLC's Certificate of Relief from Contract Voidability,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Recorded Certificate
Friday, April 12, 2024
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/12 7:08 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motions to Compel7 and Remand10 , as well as the Scheduling Conference, are taken off the 4/18/2024 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 4/18/2024. Orders with the court's rulings and scheduling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
18 18 misc For Judicial Notice Thu 04/04 5:28 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District10 filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, Pizza Hut of America, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC.(Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Standing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Business Search Result,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit C-Statement of Information
17 17 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 04/04 3:57 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration7 filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, Pizza Hut of America, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC. (Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Supplement (Motion related) Thu 04/04 3:03 PM
SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District10 Supplemental Declaration of Shawn Zaman in Support of Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Christina Chris Downs. (Zaman, Shawn)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 04/04 1:01 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10, filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, Pizza Hut of America, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC.. (Cherkaoui Jaouad, Malak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
14 14 respm Reply (Motion related) Wed 04/03 2:24 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District10 filed by Plaintiff Christina Chris Downs.(Zaman, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Shawn Zaman
Thursday, March 28, 2024
13 13 misc For Judicial Notice Thu 03/28 9:44 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, Yum Connect, LLC.(Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
12 12 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 03/28 9:37 PM
OPPOSITION opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District10 filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, Yum Connect, LLC.(Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brittany Bodkin ISO Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 5 pgs Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence ISO Defs.' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 03/26 3:44 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration7 filed by Plaintiff Christina Chris Downs.(Zaman, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of C. Downs in Support of Opposition to Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration of Shawn Zaman in Support of Opposition to Motion
Friday, March 08, 2024
10 10 motion Remand Case to State Court Fri 03/08 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Central District filed by Christina Downs Christina Chris Downs. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Zaman, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Shawn Zaman
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/05 2:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 02/29 9:36 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
7 7 motion Compel Arbitration Wed 02/28 10:15 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, Pizza Hut of America, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO,
Att: 2 Declaration of Longshore ISO,
Att: 3 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice ISO,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion
Friday, February 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 02/23 8:20 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 02/23 8:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 02/23 8:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/21 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Adrienne Mejia, PIZZA HUT OF AMERICA, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC, identifying Yum Restaurant Services Group, LLC; Yum! Brands, Inc.; Pizza Hut Holdings, LLC. (Attorney Terry L. Higham added to party Adrienne Mejia(pty:dft))(Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 02/21 4:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Adrienne Mejia, PIZZA HUT OF AMERICA, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC. (Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/21 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 24STCV01180 Receipt No: BCACDC-36953348 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Yum Connect, LLC. (Attorney Terry L. Higham added to party Yum Connect, LLC(pty:dft))(Higham, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brittany Bodkin iso Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Sarah Jordan iso Removal,
Att: 3 3 pgs Declaration of Adrienne Mejia iso Removal,
Att: 4 Declaration of Terry Higham iso Removal,
Att: 5 Request for Judicial Notice for Exhibits iso Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 02/23 8:26 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Adrienne Mejia, Pizza Hut of America, LLC, Yum Connect, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Christina Chris Downs. Filed in State Court on 1/17/2024 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 02/23 8:30 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Christina Chris Downs, upon Defendant Pizza Hut of America, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro (Authorized Agent for Service) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Filed in State Court on 1/26/2024 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit 7 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 02/23 8:33 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Christina Chris Downs, upon Defendant Yum Connect, LLC served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro (Authorized Agent for Service) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Filed in State Court on 1/26/2024 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit 8 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]