California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:24-cv-01062
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Case in other court:San Francisco, CGC-24-611488
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 1:21 AM PDT
Defendant
Fandom, Inc.
Represented By
Stephanie Alvarez Salgado
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Deborah Anne Hedley
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Erin Catherine Jones
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Ryan Tyz
Tyz Law Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Vishal Shah
Represented By
L Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Emily Ayres Horne
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jayden Kim
Represented By
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Emily Ayres Horne
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
62 62 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/07 10:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Judge Rita F. Lin: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/7/2025. Parties have reached a settlement in principle and request time for Plaintiff to obtain information from a third-party to help identify potential class members. A Status Report Re: Settlement is due by 8/8/2025, if the Motion for Preliminary Approval has not been filed. Digital Recording Time: 10:02-10:05; 10:08-10:11. Attorney for Plaintiff: Max Robert. Attorney for Defendant: Ryan Tyz. Attorney for Intervenor: Kristin Liska. Interpreter: Kristin Liska. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2025)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
61 61 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 05/06 9:39 PM
NOTICE of Change in Counsel: Attorney Deborah Hedley no longer representing Fandom, Inc. in this case (Tyz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
60 60 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 04/30 12:07 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Updated) filed by Vishal Shah, Jayden Kim.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Mediation