New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00098
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 22, 2024 2:40 AM EST
Defendant
PHILLIP GALLES (1)
Represented By
MICHAEL P. KORIBANICS
Koribanics & Koribanics
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
CAROLYN A. SILANE
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/22/2024 3:29 AM EST
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to PHILLIP GALLES (1). (jbb) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Seal Case as to PHILLIP GALLES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/10/23. (jbb) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
Arrest of PHILLIP GALLES in Northern District of Illinois. (smf) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
4 4 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to PHILLIP GALLES: Time excluded from 5/19/23 until 7/15/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/19/23. (jbb) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte:Initial Appearance as to PHILLIP GALLES held on 5/25/2023, Case unsealed. Defendant was advised of his rights, the charges against him and the penalties, counsel was appointed (CJA), defendant waived his right to a preliminary hearing, financial affidavit was executed, defendant consented to this proceeding via video, defendant waived formal reading of the complaint, brady order was placed on the record. Bail was set and conditions were placed on the record. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (smf) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 20 as to PHILLIP GALLES: Appointment of Attorney MICHAEL P. KORIBANICS for PHILLIP GALLES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/25/2023. (smf) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
8 8 VIDOEO CONSENT ORDER as to PHILLIP GALLES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/25/2023. (smf) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/25/2023. (smf) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
10 10 Unsecured Bond Entered as to PHILLIP GALLES in amount of $ 50,000. (smf) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to PHILLIP GALLES (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 5/25/2023. (smf) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to PHILLIP GALLES: Time excluded from 7/11/23 until 8/31/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/11/23. (jbb) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
13 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to PHILLIP GALLES: Time excluded from 9/1/23 until 10/31/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/1/23. (jbb) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to PHILLIP GALLES: Time excluded from 11/1/23 until 12/31/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/1/23. (jbb) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
15 15 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to PHILLIP GALLES: Time excluded from 1/2/24 until 2/29/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/2/24. (jbb) [2:23-mj-08076-JSA]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to PHILLIP GALLES (Newark - Judge Esther Salas). (ams, )
Related: [-]
16 16 INDICTMENT as to PHILLIP GALLES (1) Counts 1, 2. (ams, )
Related: [-]