Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:24-bk-10279
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Dec 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pioneer Health Systems LLC
3300 Dallas Parkway Suite 200
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Jeffrey Merritt
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Alessandra Glorioso
Dorsey & Whitney (delaware) LLP
contact info
Eric Lopez Schnabel
Dorsey & Whitney (delaware) LLP
contact info
Laura Goforth
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Courina Yulisa
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Matthew J. Olson
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Monica Niewiarowski
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Jan 09, 2025 11:26 PM EST
Claims Agent
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
D A Hearn Management LLC
621 Capitol Mall, 18th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Jamie Dreher
Downey Brand LLP
contact info
Creditor
MSC Holding, LLC d/b/a Syndeocare
Represented By
Allen DeBard
Langley & Banack, Incorporated
contact info
Andrew John Roth-Moore
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John Kendrick Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Freeway Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Irving ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John Kendrick Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Freeway, Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Frisco ISD
Represented By
Linda D. Reece
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Paul C. Dougherty
Represented By
Guillermo Ochoa-Cronfel
The Cronfel Firm
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Siena Cerra
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division
Christopher S. Murphy PO Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Christopher S. Murphy
Texas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Medport Billing, LLC
Represented By
Allen DeBard
Langley & Banack, Incorporated
contact info
Andrew John Roth-Moore
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Fwy, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Carrollton
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cit of Frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
The County of Denton, Texas
Attn: Julie Parsons PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie Anne Parsons
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg, & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
The County of Williamson, Texas
McCreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC Attn: Julie Anne Parsons PO Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Julie Anne Parsons
Mccreary, Veselka, Bragg, & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
COLLIN COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR/COLLECTOR
Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Hullet, P.C. 1700 Redbud Blvd. Suite 300
McKinney, TX 75069
Represented By
Emily Margaret Hahn
Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Hullett, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Plano ISD
Represented By
Linda D. Reece
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
North Pointe Ventures, LLC
1189 Timber Lane
Frisco, TX 75036
Represented By
Joseph M Mulvihill
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Creditor
800 Crystal Falls LLC
Sussman & Moore, LLP 2911 Turtle Creek Blvd., Ste. 1100
Dallas, TX 75219
Represented By
Weldon Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, LLP
contact info
Creditor
6125 Paseo Del Norte LLC
Represented By
Tanya M. Schierling
Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith, LLP
contact info
Michael D. Breslauer
Solomon Ward Seidenwurm & Smith
contact info
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767
Represented By
Jason A. Starks
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
PCD Building Company
Represented By
Guillermo Ochoa-Cronfel
The Cronfel Firm
contact info
Ryan E. Carreon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Tara C Pakrouh
Morris James LLP
contact info
Siena Cerra
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
The Chamberlain Family Trust, and Gilles & Laura Lehouillier
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Realtynet TIC Investments, LLC
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Thomas E. Sullivan Jr.
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Jerry and Sherre Kruft Living Trust
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
The Charles Leal Trust, Jerry and Sherre Kruft Living Trust
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
The Mortimer Family Trust
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
The William Leland Ziegler and Dana Louise Ziegler Revocable Living Trust
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Dana Louise Ziegler
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
William L. Mortimer
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Misty W. Mortimer
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Charles Leal
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Denmiss LLC
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Brandon K Bains
Bains Law PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
David Hassinger
Represented By
Steven D. Adler
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Lorelee S. Dalton
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Robert M. Chamberlain
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Mary B. Chamberlain
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Shayne Beltrami-Smith
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
BCW Enterprises LLC (Brad Woodbury)
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
William Leland Ziegler
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Trustee
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder LLC 1204 N. King Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
711 711 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/20 9:40 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10280 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Pioneer Health Systems LLC. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
710 710 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/20 9:39 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10281 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Pioneer Health Systems LLC. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
709 709 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/20 9:38 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10282 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Pioneer Health Systems LLC. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
708 708 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/20 9:37 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-10283 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Pioneer Health Systems LLC. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
707 707 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/20 9:35 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Pioneer Health Systems LLC. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
706 706 court Omnibus Hearing Dates Mon 05/19 8:11 AM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing for July 16 at 11:00 a.m. and Cancelling July 15, 2025 Hearing, US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 5/19/2025. (PS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
705 705 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 05/16 9:28 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Rescheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date from July 15, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. to July 16, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Pioneer Health Systems LLC. (Glorioso, Alessandra)
Related: [-]