New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Vera M Scanlon
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:24-cv-01248
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2024
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 11:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Honeybee Foods Corporation
Represented By
Matthew R. Capobianco
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hendrick Vangorden
Represented By
Garrett D. Kaske
Kessler Matura P.C.
contact info
Douglas M Werman
Werman Salas P.C.
contact info
Troy L. Kessler
Kessler Matura P.C.
contact info
Sally Jasmine Abrahamson
Werman Salas
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
order Order(Other) Wed 09/25 4:54 PM
ORDER. The stipulation of dismissal without prejudice at ECF No.20 is so-ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/25/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/26 9:32 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (See Order dated 9/25/2024) (SG)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 09/23 5:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Hendrick Vangorden (Kaske, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 07/10 5:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Status Report, and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Hendrick Vangorden. (Kaske, Garrett)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Stay Status Report Order Wed 07/10 1:39 PM
ORDER. The motion for a temporary stay at ECF Nos.17 and18 is granted to the extent that the time to answer or otherwise move, and to commence discovery is extended to 8/20/2024. As counsels' letters do not indicate their anticipated mediation date, the Court sets this timeframe as a reasonable one within which the parties may conduct their first mediation session. On or before 8/20/2024, counsel are to file a joint status letter with an update on their mediation schedule. If the mediation has not been scheduled, counsel should explain the delay and anticipated schedule. If mediation has not been successful, they should propose a joint discovery schedule by 8/20/2024. The schedule should include, among other things, details with regard to proposed class discovery and an anticipated date for commencing motion practice for class certification. If necessary, the Court will schedule an initial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/10/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Thu 06/20 8:39 AM
Letter Regarding the Parties' June 11 Application and Mediator Selection by Honeybee Foods Corporation (Capobianco, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Stay Tue 06/11 7:36 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint , Joint MOTION to Stay the Action Until the Conclusion of Mediation by Honeybee Foods Corporation. (Capobianco, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/29 4:29 PM
ORDER granting consent16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/14/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/29/2024. (JR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/24 4:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Honeybee Foods Corporation. (Capobianco, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
15 15 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/08 1:34 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Hector Gonzalez no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judge, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (PN)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/08 1:12 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Hendrick Vangorden. (Kaske, Garrett)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Mon 04/08 8:49 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (PN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/15 10:14 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Douglas M. Werman is granted permission to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Mr. Werman shall register for ECF at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, Mr. Werman shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 3/15/2024. (RCM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 10:09 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Douglas M. Werman) Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-17666622 by Hendrick Vangorden. (Werman, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Douglas M. Werman
Thursday, March 07, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Capobianco on behalf of Honeybee Foods Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Capobianco, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/06 10:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez on behalf of Honeybee Foods Corporation (USA) (aty to be noticed) (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Status Report Order Wed 03/06 4:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to file on the docket a joint letter describing the case and a completed civil case management plan by April 9, 2024, as further described in the attached mandatory requirements. Requests for adjournment of the deadline for these submissions will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Plaintiff's counsel shall notify Defendant's counsel of this scheduling order, in writing, as soon as reasonably possible. Although the Court will be amenable to a reasonable extension of Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, the Court will require the parties to demonstrate additional good cause to adjourn the deadline for filing the joint letter and proposed case management plan required by this Order because the Court does not need Defendant's answer to set a discovery schedule. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 3/6/2024. (RCM)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Wed 03/06 4:23 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Caption by Hendrick Vangorden. (Kaske, Garrett)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/06 4:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hendrick Vangorden. Honeybee Foods Corporation (USA) waiver sent on 2/27/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Kaske, Garrett)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Wed 03/06 4:50 PM
ORDER: The parties' joint motion to update the case caption is GRANTED. See ECF No.9 . The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove Defendant Honeybee Foods Corporation (USA) d/b/a Jollibee and to replace it with Honeybee Foods Corporation. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 3/6/2024. (PN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 02/27 10:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hector Gonzalez for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/27/2024. (CV)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Tue 02/27 1:45 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a letter no longer than three pages on or before March 8, 2024, describing Plaintiff's efforts to serve Plaintiff's complaint and a summons on Defendant. If Plaintiff fails to file the letter required by this order, or if Plaintiff's letter demonstrates a lack of diligence in attempting service, then the Court is unlikely to extend the deadline for Plaintiff to complete service under Rule 4(m) in the absence of unusual circumstances demonstrating good cause. The Court will not extend the deadline for Plaintiff to file the letter required by this order unless Plaintiff requests an extension in accordance with Section I.D of the Court's Individual Practices. Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 2/27/2024. (PN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 02/21 11:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Honeybee Foods Corporation (USA). (CV)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 02/21 11:12 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 02/21 10:54 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Jasmine Abrahamson on behalf of Hendrick Vangorden (aty to be noticed) (Abrahamson, Sally)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
3 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Hendrick Vangorden (Kessler, Troy)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett D. Kaske on behalf of Hendrick Vangorden (aty to be noticed) (Kaske, Garrett)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Honeybee Foods Corporation (USA) filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17580924 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Hendrick Vangorden. (Kessler, Troy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons