Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:24-cv-00737
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 18, 2024 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Kristi Grant
1230 Scenic Brook Trail SW
Conyers, GA 30094
Defendant
Carolyn Kelly
and All Other Occupants 1230 Scenic Brook Trail SW
Conyers, GA 30094
Plaintiff
All 3 Realty, LLC
P.O. Box 451027
Atlanta, GA 31145
Represented By
Monica Kocurek Gilroy
The Gilroy Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
7 7 utility Remark Tue 03/26 9:57 AM
Case Electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of Rockdale County re6 Order. Certified copy of remand order sent electronically. Filing Status: Submitted. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 03/26 9:52 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kristi Grant and Carolyn Kelly re6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/26 9:58 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Tue 03/26 9:04 AM
ORDER adopting3 Final Report and Recommendation. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Rockdale County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/25/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 03/22 4:59 PM
Submission of3 Final Report and Recommendation to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
5 5 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 03/04 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Carolyn Kelly, Kristi Grant.(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 03/04 3:21 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/4/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP Mon 03/04 3:14 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Rockdale County. Defendant's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees of Costs1 is GRANTED. As this is a Final Report and Recommendation, there is nothing further in this action pending before the undersigned. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/4/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/04 3:22 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kristi Grant, Carolyn Kelly re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and3 Final Report and Recommendation. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/04 3:24 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kristi Grant, Carolyn Kelly re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation and3 Final Report and Recommendation. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Kocurek Gilroy on behalf of All 3 Realty, LLC (Gilroy, Monica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/21 3:10 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/21 3:04 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristi Grant. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet