Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela Pepper
Case #: 2:24-cv-00223
Nature of Suit560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, August 22, 2024
17 17 order Judgment Thu 08/22 2:16 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/22/2024. (cc: all counsel and mailed to William Chambers, c/o Agent Adam Smith, 2902 N. Mason St., Appleton, WI 54914)(cb)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 08/22 2:14 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/22/2024.4 Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee DENIED AS MOOT. Case DISMISSED for plaintiff's failure to pay initial partial filing fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to William Chambers, c/o Agent Adam Smith, 2902 N. Mason St., Appleton, WI 54914)(cb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/23 10:50 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/23/2024. By end of day 8/16/2024, plaintiff to pay $17.34 initial partial filing fee or file written explanation why he can't pay; failure to comply by deadline will result in dismissal. (cc: all counsel and mailed to William Chambers V, c/o Agent Adam Smith, 2902 N. Mason St., Appleton, WI 54914)(cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
14 14 misc Mail Returned Tue 06/11 8:53 AM
Mail Sent to William Robert Chambers, V Returned as Undeliverable re 12 Text Only Order. Returned as "Attempted - Not Known". (edr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Tue 05/21 10:50 AM
LETTER from William Robert Chambers, V re ruling on11 Motion. Additional copy of 12 TOO sent.(edr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
12 12 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 05/08 9:17 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/8/2024 re11 plaintiff's letter motion for an extension of time to pay his initial partial filing fee. The court FINDS that the plaintiff has shown good cause and GRANTS his motion. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to pay the $17.34 initial partial filing fee is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 2, 2024. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to William Chambers at Outagamie County Jail)(cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/07 10:59 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by William Robert Chambers, V. (edr)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Tue 05/07 10:58 AM
LETTER from William Robert Chambers, V receipt of documents. (edr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
9 9 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 03/28 11:17 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/28/2024 re7 plaintiff's letter request (dated March 15, 2024) for extension of time to pay initial partial filing fee. The plaintiff states that he does "not know the outcome of [his] release date pending revocation hearing on March 21st of 2024" and he asks to extend the deadline to pay the initial partial filing fee "until the case is settled." Dkt. No. 7. It is not clear whether or when the plaintiff's case will be settled, but the court FINDS that the plaintiff has shown good cause and GRANTS his request for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to pay the $17.34 initial partial filing fee is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 2, 2024. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to William Chambers at Outagamie County Jail)(cb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Wed 03/27 3:42 PM
LETTER from William Robert Chambers, V re medication issues.(edr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits- Grievance Documents
7 7 motion Extension of Time Wed 03/27 2:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by William Robert Chambers, V. (edr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Wed 03/06 2:47 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/6/2024. On or before 4/2/2024 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $17.34 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Outagamie County Sheriff; William Chambers at Outagamie County Jail)(cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
5 5 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 03/04 4:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William Robert Chambers, V. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (edr)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Mon 03/04 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff William Robert Chambers, V. (vkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 misc Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate Wed 02/21 1:35 PM
LETTER from the clerk to William Robert Chambers, V re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee be filed within 21 days. (ams)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
2 2 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 02/21 11:41 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William Robert Chambers, V. (ams)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Prisoner Wed 02/21 11:22 AM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by William Robert Chambers, V. (ams)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope