Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00041
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 22, 2024 2:20 AM EST
Defendant
Sean Michael Johnson (1)
Represented By
Jessica Ann Richardson
Patrick N. Anderson And Associates PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Michael Carter
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/22/2024 2:59 AM EST
Friday, December 01, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Sean Michael Johnson (1), Chase Scott Jones (2). (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Sean Michael Johnson, Chase Scott Jones1 Complaint. (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
4 4 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet. (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Sean Michael Johnson, Chase Scott Jones. (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Seal until all defendants are arrested as to Sean Michael Johnson (1), Chase Scott Jones (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/1/2023. (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis in case as to Sean Michael Johnson, Chase Scott Jones. (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
Arrest of Sean Michael Johnson in District of Oregon. (jlan) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
8 8 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received from the District of Oregon as to Sean Michael Johnson.(jlan) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christopher Michael Carter appearing for USA. (Carter, Christopher) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica Ann Richardson appearing for Sean Michael Johnson (Richardson, Jessica) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: Initial Appearance as to Sean Michael Johnson held on 1/3/2024. USA appeared through Christopher Carter. Deft appeared w/counsel Jessica Richardson. Deft informed of rights, charges and penalties. Counsel for the parties and the defendant were orally advised of the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. USA seeks detention-Granted. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 1/5/2024 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Deft remanded to the custody of the USMS pending next hearing. (Tape #FTR.)(tfitz, ) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including vacating a conviction or disciplinary action against the prosecution. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Sean Michael Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 1/3/24. (tfitz, ) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
14 14 Temporary Detention Order as to Sean Michael Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 1/3/24. (tfitz, ) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
19 19 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/7/2023 in case as to Sean Michael Johnson. (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
16 16 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Sean Michael Johnson.(Carter, Christopher) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Sean Michael Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 01/04/2024. (wgar) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
21 21 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Sean Michael Johnson. (stewart, mariel) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: Matter came on for a Preliminary Hearing-not held. USA appeared through Christopher Carter. Deft appeared w/counsel Jessica Richardson. PH waived; PC found. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Detention Hearing as to Sean Michael Johnson held on 1/5/2024. USA seeks detention; Deft argues for Bond w/conditions-DENIED. Deft remanded to USMS custody w/o Bond pending trial. (Tape #FTR.)(tfitz, ) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
25 25 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Sean Michael Johnson (tfitz, ) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
26 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict Consent by USA as to Sean Michael Johnson. (Carter, Christopher) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Sean Michael Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 01/05/2024. (jlan) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER granting26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict Consent as to Sean Michael Johnson (1). ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including February 8, 2024. Accordingly, the delay resulting from the pending motion for extension shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment must be filed. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/5/2024. (Dest) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
33 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (Second) by USA as to Sean Michael Johnson. (Carter, Christopher) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
34 34 ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including March 9, 2024. Accordingly, the delay resulting from the pending motion for extension shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment must be filed. No further extension will be granted in re33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (Second) as to Sean Michael Johnson (1). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/5/2024. (swil) [1:23-mj-00262-WEF]
Related: [-]